Wang v. Audentes Therapeutics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elaine Wang
Defendant: Julie Anne Smith, Matthew R. Patterson, Jennifer Jarrett, Audentes Therapeutics, Inc., Mark Goldberg, Louis G. Lange, Scott Morrison and Thomas J. Schuetz
Case Number: 3:2019cv08324
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Elaine Wang. Service waived by Matthew R. Patterson waiver sent on 12/27/2019, answer due 2/25/2020. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Elaine Wang. Service waived by Julie Anne Smith waiver sent on 12/27/2019, answer due 2/25/2020. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Elaine Wang. Service waived by Thomas J. Schuetz waiver sent on 12/27/2019, answer due 2/25/2020. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Elaine Wang. Service waived by Scott Morrison waiver sent on 12/27/2019, answer due 2/25/2020. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Elaine Wang. Service waived by Louis G. Lange waiver sent on 12/27/2019, answer due 2/25/2020. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Elaine Wang. Service waived by Jennifer Jarrett waiver sent on 12/27/2019, answer due 2/25/2020. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Elaine Wang. Service waived by Mark Goldberg waiver sent on 12/27/2019, answer due 2/25/2020. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Elaine Wang. Service waived by Audentes Therapeutics, Inc. waiver sent on 12/27/2019, answer due 2/25/2020. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing date on a Thursday at 08:00 AM. The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 01/06/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elaine Wang.. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet by Elaine Wang . (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Audentes Therapeutics, Inc., Mark Goldberg, Jennifer Jarrett, Louis G. Lange, Scott Morrison, Matthew R. Patterson, Thomas J. Schuetz, Julie Anne Smith. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet JS 44 (Rev. 06/17) used at case opening. Please complete and re-file as a s eparate docket entry current Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19. Re: #1 . #1 Complaint filed by Elaine Wang (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Elaine Wang (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14001642.). Filed byElaine Wang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Byrd, Rachele) (Filed on 12/20/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. Audentes Therapeutics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Anne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew R. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audentes Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis G. Lange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Schuetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Wang
Represented By: Rachele R. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?