Barcus et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Tajammal Hayat, Artis Francies, Heidi DeSesa, Jennifer J. Leonard, Adrian Read, Benjamin Chadsey, Brian Phillips, Terrell Brown, April Clarence, Brent D. Carter, Rosemary Bolling, Ronald Wise, Bryan White, Charles Daniels, Kathleen Fieser, Renee Gordon, Escolastico Romero, Chrystel Tankersley, Ronald Roy, Nannette Vega, Donald Tucker, Joyce Farrow, Philip Theodorou, Daniel M. Blanzy, Bryan Harris, Ivy Castleton, Loretta Anne Barcus, Joseph Ritzke, Zita Tutor, Virginia Steele, Tammi Perry and Cathy Flanders
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv08359
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brian E. Farnan filed by Loretta Anne Barcus, Daniel M. Blanzy, Rosemary Bolling, Terrell Brown, Brent D. Carter, Ivy Castleton, Benjamin Chadsey, April Clarence, Charles Daniels, Heidi DeSesa, Joyce Farrow, Kathleen Fieser, Cathy Flanders, Artis Francies, Renee Gordon, Bryan Harris, Tajammal Hayat, Jennifer J. Leonard, Tammi Perry, Brian Phillips, Adrian Read, Joseph Ritzke, Escolastico Romero, Ronald Roy, Virginia Steele, Chrystel Tankersley, Philip Theodorou, Donald Tucker, Zita Tutor, Nannette Vega, Bryan White, Ronald Wise. Responses due by 2/24/2020. Replies due by 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Prop Order Granting Motion)(Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION to dismiss all but lead plaintiff per PTO 155 filed by Loretta Anne Barcus, Daniel M. Blanzy, Rosemary Bolling, Terrell Brown, Brent D. Carter, Ivy Castleton, Benjamin Chadsey, April Clarence, Charles Daniels, Heidi DeSesa, Joyce Farrow, Kathleen Fieser, Cathy Flanders, Artis Francies, Renee Gordon, Bryan Harris, Tajammal Hayat, Jennifer J. Leonard, Tammi Perry, Brian Phillips, Adrian Read, Joseph Ritzke, Escolastico Romero, Ronald Roy, Virginia Steele, Chrystel Tankersley, Philip Theodorou, Donald Tucker, Zita Tutor, Nannette Vega, Bryan White, Ronald Wise. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
December 23, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Delaware, 1:19-cv-02212, Barcus et al v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-08359-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 173 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:19-cv-02212. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER by the UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL on MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02211-CFC, 1:19-cv-02212-CFC(nmf)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Ritzke, Escolastico Romero, Cathy Flanders, Loretta Anne Barcus, Nannette Vega, Daniel M. Blanzy, Virginia Steele, Tajammal Hayat, Ivy Castleton, Benjamin Chadsey, Joyce Farrow, Brian Phillips, Renee Gordon, Tammi Perry, April Clarence, Bryan White, Donald Tucker, Brent D. Carter, Artis Francies, Zita Tutor, Philip Theodorou, Adrian Read, Ronald Wise, Jennifer J. Leonard, Bryan Harris, Rosemary Bolling, Charles Daniels, Heidi DeSesa, Ronald Roy, Kathleen Fieser, Terrell Brown, Chrystel Tankersley. Monsanto Company served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Farnan, Michael)
December 4, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02211-CFC, 1:19-cv-02212-CFC (rjb)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Action by Loretta Anne Barcus, Daniel M. Blanzy, Rosemary Bolling, Terrell Brown, Brent D. Carter, Ivy Castleton, Benjamin Chadsey, April Clarence, Charles Daniels, Heidi DeSesa, Joyce Farrow, Kathleen Fieser, Cathy Flanders, Artis Francies, Renee Gordon, Bryan Harris, Tajammal Hayat, Jennifer J. Leonard, Tammi Perry, Brian Phillips, Adrian Read, Joseph Ritzke, Escolastico Romero, Ronald Roy, Virginia Steele, Chrystel Tankersley, Philip Theodorou, Donald Tucker, Zita Tutor, Nannette Vega, Bryan White, Ronald Wise (Farnan, Michael)
December 2, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Monsanto Company on 12/2/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mal)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Monsanto Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2789762.) - filed by Joseph Ritzke, Escolastico Romero, Cathy Flanders, Loretta Anne Barcus, Nannette Vega, Daniel M. Blanzy, Virginia Steele, Tajammal Hayat, Ivy Castleton, Benjamin Chadsey, Joyce Farrow, Brian Phillips, Renee Gordon, Tammi Perry, April Clarence, Bryan White, Donald Tucker, Brent D. Carter, Artis Francies, Zita Tutor, Philip Theodorou, Adrian Read, Ronald Wise, Jennifer J. Leonard, Bryan Harris, Rosemary Bolling, Charles Daniels, Heidi DeSesa, Ronald Roy, Kathleen Fieser, Terrell Brown, Chrystel Tankersley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barcus et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tajammal Hayat
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artis Francies
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi DeSesa
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer J. Leonard
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Read
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Chadsey
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Phillips
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Brown
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Clarence
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent D. Carter
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Bolling
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Wise
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan White
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Daniels
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Fieser
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Gordon
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Escolastico Romero
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrystel Tankersley
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Roy
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nannette Vega
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Tucker
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Farrow
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Theodorou
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel M. Blanzy
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Harris
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivy Castleton
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Anne Barcus
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Ritzke
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zita Tutor
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Steele
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammi Perry
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Flanders
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?