Pizarro, et al v. Astra Flooring Company et al
Plaintiff: Renato C Pizarro and Mercedita D. Pizarro
Defendant: John Crane Inc., Astra Flooring Company, Darcoid Company of California, Spirax Sarco, Inc., National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, Grinnell LLC, Atwood & Morrill Co.,Inc., Pep Boys - Manny Moe & Jack of California, Crane Co., York International Corp., Flowserve US Inc., Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Hill Brothers Chemical Company, ITT LLC, Goulds Pumps LLC, BW/IP, Inc., FMC Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company ITT Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, CBS Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., Atwood & Morrill Co.,Inc. doing business as Weir Valves and Controls USA Inc., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Allied Signal, Inc., Viacom, Inc. and CBS Corporations Pennsylvania Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv08425
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 125 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 124 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 123 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Astra Flooring Company (Glinka, Patrick) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 122 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 121 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 120 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 119 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 118 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 117 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 116 NOTICE of Adoption of Previously Filed State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium by Union Carbide Corporation (Haran, Gina) (Filed on 2/19/2020) Modified on 2/20/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2020 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Ann Haran (Haran, Gina) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 114 Certificate of Interested Entities by Union Carbide Corporation (Haran, Gina) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 113 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by FMC Corporation (Smith, Harrison) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO DISMISS JOHN CRANE, INC. AND WITHDRAW PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/18/2020. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 111 REPLY (re #84 MOTION to Remand ) to NASSCO's Opposition filed byMercedita D. Pizarro, Renato C Pizarro. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Amell, David) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 110 Joint Stipulation and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant John Crane Inc. by Mercedita D. Pizarro, Renato C Pizarro (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Amell, David) (Filed on 2/14/2020) Modified on 2/18/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED #100 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE BRIEFING AND HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines re #109 Order on Stipulation: Motion Hearing re #10 MOTION to Dismiss previously set for 3/12/2020 08:00 AM is rescheduled to 4/9/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 108 OBJECTIONS to re #84 MOTION to Remand (Plaintiffs' Evidence in Support of) by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 107 Request for Judicial Notice re #84 MOTION to Remand filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Related document(s) #84 ) (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 2/7/2020) Modified on 2/10/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2020 Filing 106 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #84 MOTION to Remand ) filed byNational Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 105 EXHIBITS re #101 Opposition/Response to Motion to Remand (Exhibits 12 and 13) filed byJohn Crane Inc.. (Related document(s) #101 ) (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 104 EXHIBITS re #101 Opposition/Response to Motion to Remand (Exhibits 7-11) filed byJohn Crane Inc.. (Related document(s) #101 ) (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 103 EXHIBITS re #101 Opposition/Response to Motion to Remand (Exhibits 4C-6) filed byJohn Crane Inc.. (Related document(s) #101 ) (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 102 EXHIBITS re #101 Opposition/Response to Motion to Remand (Exhibits 1-4B) filed byJohn Crane Inc.. (Related document(s) #101 ) (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 101 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #85 MOTION to Remand , #84 MOTION to Remand ) filed by John Crane Inc.. (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 2/7/2020) Modified on 2/10/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2020 Filing 100 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mercedita D. Pizarro, Renato C Pizarro and John Crane Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Amell, David) (Filed on 2/7/2020) Modified on 2/10/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2020 Filing 99 NOTICE OF RE-FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Flowserve US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit STATE ANSWER)(Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 2/7/2020) Modified on 2/10/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2020 Filing 98 Certificate of Interested Entities by Flowserve US Inc. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Denine Brown Yuen on Behalf of DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE US, INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE OF RE-FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by BW/IP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit STATE ANSWER)(Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 2/6/2020) Modified on 2/6/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2020 Filing 95 Certificate of Interested Entities by BW/IP, Inc. listing corporate parent Flowserve Corporation (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 2/6/2020) Modified on 2/6/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Denine Brown Yuen on Behalf of DEFENDANT BW/IP, INC. (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #92 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Brian J. Schneider. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 92 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Brian J. Schneider ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14135054.) filed by John Crane Inc.. (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 91 Certificate of Interested Entities by Flowserve US Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc.. (Kelly, Daniel) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel James Kelly NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY COUNSEL DANIEL J. KELLY (Kelly, Daniel) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
January 31, 2020 Filing 89 EXHIBITS re #87 Notice (Other) Attachment to Amended Notice filed by Mercedita D. Pizarro, Renato C Pizarro. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #87 ) (Amell, David) (Filed on 1/31/2020) Modified on 2/4/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2020 Filing 88 EXHIBITS re #86 Notice (Other) Attachment to Amended Notice filed by Mercedita D. Pizarro, Renato C Pizarro. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #86 ) (Amell, David) (Filed on 1/31/2020) Modified on 2/4/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2020 Filing 87 AMENDED NOTICE by Mercedita D. Pizarro, Renato C Pizarro re #84 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Amell, David) (Filed on 1/31/2020) Modified on 2/4/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2020 Filing 86 AMENDED NOTICE by Mercedita D. Pizarro, Renato C Pizarro re #85 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Amell, David) (Filed on 1/31/2020) Modified on 2/4/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 85 MOTION to Remand filed by Mercedita D. Pizarro, Renato C Pizarro. Responses due by 2/7/2020. Replies due by 2/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Evidentiary Objections, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Declaration Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #10 Exhibit Exhibit F to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #11 Exhibit Exhibit G to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #12 Exhibit Exhibit H to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #13 Exhibit Exhibit I to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #14 Exhibit Exhibit J to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #15 Exhibit Exhibit K to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #16 Exhibit Exhibit L to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #17 Exhibit Exhibit M to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #18 Exhibit Exhibit N to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #19 Exhibit Exhibit O to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #20 Exhibit Exhibit P to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #21 Exhibit Exhibit Q to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #22 Exhibit Exhibit R to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #23 Declaration Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #34 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #35 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #36 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #37 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #38 Exhibit Exhibit 15 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #39 Exhibit Exhibit 16 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #40 Exhibit Exhibit 17 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #41 Exhibit Exhibit 18 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #42 Exhibit Exhibit 19 to the Exhibit to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #43 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate/Proof of Service)(Amell, David) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 84 MOTION to Remand filed by Mercedita D. Pizarro, Renato C Pizarro. Responses due by 2/7/2020. Replies due by 2/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Evidentiary Objections, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Declaration Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #10 Exhibit Exhibit F to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #11 Exhibit Exhibit G to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #12 Exhibit Exhibit H to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #13 Exhibit Exhibit I to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #14 Exhibit Exhibit J to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #15 Exhibit Exhibit K to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #16 Exhibit Exhibit L to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #17 Exhibit Exhibit M to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #18 Exhibit Exhibit N to the Declaration of Carlos Guzman, #19 Declaration Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to the Declaration of Francis J. Burger, #34 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate/Proof of Service)(Amell, David) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 83 CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge William Alsup upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Alsup's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing re #85 MOTION to Remand set for 3/11/2020 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 3/4/2020. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020) Modified on 1/31/2020 (tlhS, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2020 Filing 82 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spirax Sarco, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Spirax-Sarco Investments, LTD, Other Affiliate Spirax-Sarco Engineering, plc, Other Affiliate Sarco International Corporation, a Delaware corporation for Spirax Sarco, Inc.. and Certification of Interested Entities and Persons (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 23, 2020 Set/Reset Hearing re #10 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2020 at 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING #72 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE BRIEFING AND HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER RELATING PIZARRO V. ASTRA FLOORING COMPANY (19-CV-08425 WHA) AND PIZARRO V. ASTRA FLOORING COMPANY (19-CV-08427 JCS) by Judge William Alsup.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 79 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Atwood & Morrill Co.,Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Weir Group PLC for Atwood & Morrill Co.,Inc.. (Bergstrom, Emily D.) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily D. Diane Bergstrom (Bergstrom, Emily D.) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE by Atwood & Morrill Co.,Inc. Notice of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill (Bergstrom, Emily D.) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Mirna Jeftic Scheffy On Behalf of John Crane Inc. (Scheffy, Mirna) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 75 Certificate of Interested Entities by IMO Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for IMO Industries, Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 74 Defendant Imo Industries Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium byIMO Industries, Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Bobbie Rae Bailey Frederick W. Gatt,and Olga G. Pena (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulation filed by Mercedita D. Pizarro, Renato C Pizarro and John Crane Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate/Proof of Service)(Amell, David) (Filed on 1/17/2020) Modified on 1/17/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE by Mercedita D. Pizarro, Renato C Pizarro Notice of Related Cases (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate/Proof of Service)(Amell, David) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 70 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byITT LLC. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 69 Certificate of Interested Entities by ITT LLC identifying Corporate Parent ITT Inc. for ITT LLC. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 68 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by ITT LLC identifying Corporate Parent ITT Inc. for ITT LLC. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 67 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ITT LLC.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves , Joseph Duffy and Amy J. Talarico (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 65 Certificate of Interested Entities by Goulds Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent ITT Inc. for Goulds Pumps LLC. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 64 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Goulds Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent ITT Inc. for Goulds Pumps LLC. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 63 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Goulds Pumps LLC.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE by Goulds Pumps LLC of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves , Joseph Duffy and Amy J. Talarico (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 60 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hill Brothers Chemical Company identifying Corporate Parent Hill Brothers Chemical Company for Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 59 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Hill Brothers Chemical Company identifying Corporate Parent Hill Brothers Chemical Company for Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 58 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hill Brothers Chemical Company.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE by Hill Brothers Chemical Company of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves , Joseph Duffy and Amy J. Talarico (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 55 Certificate of Interested Entities by Grinnell LLC identifying Corporate Parent Tyco International plc for Grinnell LLC. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 54 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Grinnell LLC identifying Corporate Parent Tyco International plc for Grinnell LLC. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 53 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Grinnell LLC.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE by Grinnell LLC of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves , Joseph Duffy and Amy J. Talarico (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 50 Certificate of Interested Entities by York International Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corp.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 49 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by York International Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corp.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 48 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by York International Corp... (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE by York International Corp. of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves , Joseph Duffy and Amy J. Talarico (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo for Defendant General Electric Company (Anselmo, Emily) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner for Defendant General Electric Company (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon for Defendant General Electric Company (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 41 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE by General Electric Company of Re-filing It's State Answer (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson for Defendant General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 01/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 37 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Astra Flooring Company.. (Glinka, Patrick) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 35 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FMC Corporation.. (Smith, Harrison) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 34 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Genuine Parts Company.. (Burch, Dana) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 33 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Crane Inc... (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Leigh Burch on behalf of FMC Corporation (Burch, Dana) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 31 Defendant Astra Flooring Company's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium - Asbestos; Demand for Jury Trial byAstra Flooring Company. (Glinka, Patrick) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Glinka on behalf of ASTRA FLOORING COMPANY (Glinka, Patrick) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Entities by Astra Flooring Company or Persons/Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 3-15 (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Dennis Pond on behalf of ASTRA FLOORING COMPANY (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 27 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CAES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. Responses due by 1/14/2020. (Brydon, John) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan L Flinders on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Flinders, Ethan) (Filed on 1/9/2020) Modified on 1/9/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer and Demand for Jury Trial by FMC Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Smith, Harrison) (Filed on 1/9/2020) Modified on 1/9/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2020 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Entities by FMC Corporation (Smith, Harrison) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Dennis Pond (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison Scott Smith (Smith, Harrison) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Carter Pieper (Pieper, Timothy) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Genuine Parts Company Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 and Local Rule 3-15 (Burch, Dana) (Filed on 1/9/2020) Modified on 1/9/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer and Demand for Jury Trial by Genuine Parts Company re #1 Notice of Removal (Burch, Dana) (Filed on 1/9/2020) Modified on 1/9/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Dennis Pond on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 1/9/2020) Modified on 1/9/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Graham on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Graham, Michael) (Filed on 1/9/2020) Modified on 1/9/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company by Dana Leigh Burch (Burch, Dana) (Filed on 1/9/2020) Modified on 1/9/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Douglas Jamison on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS Inc. f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusement, Inc., Corporate Parent ViacomCBS Inc. for CBS Corporation. ViacomCBS Inc. f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Nicole Empting ViacomCBS Inc. f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) ViacomCBS Inc. f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation byCBS Corporation. (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 1/14/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Crane Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 1/17/2020. Replies due by 1/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration CARRIE LIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JOHN CRANE INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. RULE CIV. PROC. 12(B)(6), #2 Proposed Order)(Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) bySpirax Sarco, Inc.. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Flowserve US Inc. of Filing State Court Answer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/20/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 Joinder to #1 Defendants John Crane Inc. and National Steel and Shipbuilding Company's Notices of Removal of Civil Action by Spirax Sarco, Inc.. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 12/27/2019) Modified on 12/27/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case by National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Bessette, Paul) (Filed on 12/27/2019) Modified on 12/27/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/10/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by John Crane Inc. . (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Crane Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Smith Group Inter. Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent Smiths Groups PLC for John Crane Inc.. (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action from Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is RG19044035. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-14016435). Filed by John Crane Inc.. (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 12/26/2019) Modified on 12/27/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pizarro, et al v. Astra Flooring Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc.
Represented By: Carrie S. Lin
Represented By: Mirna Jeftic Scheffy
Represented By: Claire Christine Weglarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astra Flooring Company
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: Patrick J. Glinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darcoid Company of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Represented By: Lance Douglas Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company
Represented By: Paul M. Bessette
Represented By: John R. Brydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co.,Inc.
Represented By: Kurt Tyler Putnam
Represented By: Alex Paul Catalona
Represented By: Emily D. Bergstrom
Represented By: Julie Elizabeth Hayashida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pep Boys - Manny Moe & Jack of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corp.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Denine Brown Yuen
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Represented By: Daniel James Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: Ethan L Flinders
Represented By: Michael A. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole B Yuen
Represented By: Suzanna L. Minasian
Represented By: Nicole Denine Brown Yuen
Represented By: Keith Michael Ameele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: Timothy Carter Pieper
Represented By: Harrison Scott Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company ITT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Gina Ann Haran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick W. Gatt
Represented By: Olga Guadalupe Pena
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co.,Inc. doing business as Weir Valves and Controls USA Inc.
Represented By: Kurt Tyler Putnam
Represented By: Alex Paul Catalona
Represented By: Emily D. Bergstrom
Represented By: Julie Elizabeth Hayashida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Signal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporations Pennsylvania Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renato C Pizarro
Represented By: David Lee Amell
Represented By: Carlos Jorge Enrique Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedita D. Pizarro
Represented By: David Lee Amell
Represented By: Carlos Jorge Enrique Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?