Kinney v. Gutierrez et al
Plaintiff: Charles Kinney
Defendant: Philip S. Gutierrez
Case Number: 3:2019mc80018
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Charles Kinney. Appeal of Order #3 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 Request for permission to file a notice of appeal filed by Charles Kinney. Responses due by 4/8/2019. Replies due by 4/15/2019. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE PREFILING REVIEW. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/28/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Remark: Plaintiff a vexatious litigant, see order document #56 in case 18-cv-1041-EMC (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 Received Document: Complaint by Charles Kinney. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cpS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinney v. Gutierrez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip S. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?