Lewis et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Catherine Lewis and Robert Lewis
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00068
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Eastern District of Missouri, 19-03073 Lewis, opened in California Northern District as 20-00068 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 176 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-03073. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California (DLB)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-176) regarding multidistrict litigation by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel (DLB)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Catherine Lewis, Robert Lewis. Monsanto Company served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Adler, Enrique)
November 12, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to E. Elliot Adler. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MFG)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Catherine Lewis, Robert Lewis Process Server: HPS Process Service and Investigations (MFG) Modified on 11/12/2019 (MFG).
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Demand For Jury Trial against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7575484, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Catherine Lewis, Robert Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Form Notice Of Intent To Use Process Server)(Adler, Enrique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Lewis
Represented By: Enrique Elliot Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lewis
Represented By: Enrique Elliot Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?