Silver et al v. BA Sports Nutrition, LLC
Plaintiff: Heather Peffer, Donovan Marshall, Alexander Hill and Marc Silver
Defendant: BA Sports Nutrition, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00633
Filed: January 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by BA Sports Nutrition, LLC (Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by BA Sports Nutrition, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 4/6/2020. Replies due by 4/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Borden, #2 Declaration of Leo Soffer, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Proposed Order)(Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Olivia Zinsou (Zinsou, Tracy) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2020 at 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 SI Standing Order, #2 Standing Order, #3 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by BA Sports Nutrition, LLC. (Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 2/19/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BA Sports Nutrition, LLC.. (Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonas Noah Hagey (Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David Howard Kwasniewski (Kwasniewski, David) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Brooks Borden (Borden, Matthew) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Maia C. Katz representing Plaintiff. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14170549) filed by Alexander Hill, Donovan Marshall, Heather Peffer, Marc Silver. (Kats, Maia) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alexander Hill, Donovan Marshall, Heather Peffer, Marc Silver.. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marc Silver, Alexander Hill, Donovan Marshall, Heather Peffer. BA Sports Nutrition, LLC served on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet by Alexander Hill, Donovan Marshall, Heather Peffer, Marc Silver [Corrected]. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Defendant BA Sports Nutrition, LLC. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/11/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Defendant BA Sports Nutrition, LLC, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14114061). Filed by Marc Silver, Alexander Hill, Donovan Marshall, Heather Peffer. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 1/28/2020) Modified on 1/29/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet CAND 44 (Rev. 06/17) used at case opening. Please complete correct Civil Cov er Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19) and file as a separate docket entry re Complaint ( #1 . #1 ) filed by Marc Silver, Donovan Marshall, Alexander Hill, Heather Peffer (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silver et al v. BA Sports Nutrition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Peffer
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Represented By: Maia Kats
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade
Represented By: Mario M Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donovan Marshall
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Represented By: Maia Kats
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade
Represented By: Mario M Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Hill
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Represented By: Maia Kats
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade
Represented By: Mario M Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Silver
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Represented By: Maia Kats
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: George Volney Granade
Represented By: Mario M Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BA Sports Nutrition, LLC
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Tracy Olivia Zinsou
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Borden
Represented By: David Howard Kwasniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?