Hurt v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: William Edward Hurt
Defendant: Candiece L. Lewis, Ryan Walsh, John Tyler, James Gay, Warren Lee and City and County of San Francisco
Case Number: 3:2020cv00889
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City and County of San Francisco, James Gay, Warren Lee, Candiece L. Lewis, John Tyler, Ryan Walsh.. (Collins, Kelly) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City and County of San Francisco, James Gay, Warren Lee, Candiece L. Lewis, John Tyler, Ryan Walsh.. (Collins, Kelly) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCity and County of San Francisco, James Gay, Warren Lee, Candiece L. Lewis, John Tyler, Ryan Walsh. (Collins, Kelly) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Edward Hurt. All Defendants. Certificate/Proof of Service City and County of San Francisco (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Sgt. Candiece L. Lewis, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Officer Warren Lee, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Officer John Tyler, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service Officer Ryan Walsh, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service Officer James G. Gay)(Lagos, Panos) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 12 Declaration of Panos Lagos in Support of #11 Order DECLARATION OF PANOS LAGOS RE: IFP APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, WILLIAM EDWARD HURT filed byWilliam Edward Hurt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF ALICIA HUBBS RE: IFP APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, WILLIAM EDWARD HURT)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Lagos, Panos) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF ATTORNEY DECLARATION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/13/2020. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2020 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 2/11/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by William Edward Hurt.. (Lagos, Panos) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to City and County of San Francisco, James Gay, Warren Lee, Candiece L. Lewis, John Tyler, Ryan Walsh. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Schmidt, Sanjay) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 6, 2020 #Electronic filing error. E-filer is reminded to enter parties' names correctly. William Edward Hurt has been entered as William Hurt and Candiece L. Lewis entered as Candiece Lewis. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. [1-3] is also erroneous with completely different defendants on the caption. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2020 10:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/20/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Hurt. (Schmidt, Sanjay) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR CIVIL RIGHTS VIOLATIONS against All Defendants. Filed byWilliam Hurt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, #2 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Summons)(Schmidt, Sanjay) (Filed on 2/5/2020) Modified on 2/6/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurt v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candiece L. Lewis
Represented By: Kelly Marie Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Walsh
Represented By: Kelly Marie Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Tyler
Represented By: Kelly Marie Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gay
Represented By: Kelly Marie Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Lee
Represented By: Kelly Marie Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Kelly Marie Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Edward Hurt
Represented By: Sanjay S. Schmidt
Represented By: Panos Lagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?