Protective Life Insurance Company v. Tan et al
Plaintiff: Protective Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Chao H.Tan, The Estate of Alvin Jow, Jon Buchwald, Sheila Buchwald and Chao Hui Tan
Case Number: 3:2020cv01080
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION TO FILE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER. The Buchwalds' deadline to file an answer is extended to April 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 27, 2020. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 27, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jon Buchwald, Sheila Buchwald re #17 Answer to Complaint in Interpleader (Castillo, Robert) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 27, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Castillo (Castillo, Robert) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 27, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint in Interpleader byJon Buchwald, Sheila Buchwald. (Castillo, Robert) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, filed by Jon Buchwald, Sheila Buchwald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Castillo, Robert) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Protective Life Insurance Company (Rucker, Cindy) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 12, 2020. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2020 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint ase Management Statement due by 5/8/2020.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order for Judge Maxine M.Chesney, #2 Standing Order for All Judges)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 03/04/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Protective Life Insurance Company.. (Rucker, Cindy) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 9 Refund Status re #7 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/13/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 Application for Refund re #6 Refund Status, #5 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14165497 by Protective Life Insurance Company. (Rucker, Cindy) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 Refund Status re #5 Application for Refund DECLINED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14165575 by Protective Life Insurance Company. (Rucker, Cindy) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/4/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/26/2020. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Protective Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Protective Life Corporation, Corporate Parent Dai-ichi Life Insurance Company, Limited for Protective Life Insurance Company. (Rucker, Cindy) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against Chao H.Tan, The Estate of Alvin Jow ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14165575.). Filed byProtective Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rucker, Cindy) (Filed on 2/11/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Protective Life Insurance Company v. Tan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Protective Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Cindy M. Rucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chao H.Tan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Alvin Jow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Buchwald
Represented By: Robert Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Buchwald
Represented By: Robert Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chao Hui Tan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?