Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc. et al v. ADS Media Marketing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: louis floyd and Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc.
Defendant: ADS MEDIA MARKETING, INC., James Jenkins and ADS Media Marketing, Inc. doing business as My Supernova
Case Number: 3:2020cv01170
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Telephone Consumer Protection Act (TCPA)
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc., Louis Floyd.. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ADS Media Marketing, Inc., James Jenkins. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/28/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc., louis floyd . (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against ADS Media Marketing, Inc., James Jenkins (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-14181218.). Filed by Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc., Louis Floyd. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 2/14/2020) Modified on 2/18/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc. et al v. ADS Media Marketing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADS MEDIA MARKETING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADS Media Marketing, Inc. doing business as My Supernova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: louis floyd
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Represented By: Adrian R. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Represented By: Adrian R. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?