Anderson et al v. Starbucks Corporation
Plaintiff: Christina Denton, Katherine Butler, James Hancock, Jorge Gonzalez, Jeffrey Bellows, Michael Whiter, Donnie Hyso, Cheyenne Chitry, Elizabeth Anderson, Cassandra Sweeney, Jacqueline Foster and Erik Lorack
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv01178
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Remand ) In Support of Motion to Remand filed byElizabeth Anderson, Jeffrey Bellows, Katherine Butler, Cheyenne Chitry, Christina Denton, Jacqueline Foster, Jorge Gonzalez, James Hancock, Donnie Hyso, Erik Lorack, Cassandra Sweeney, Michael Whiter. (Wynne, Edward) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
March 27, 2020 Filing 16 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Remand ) filed byStarbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF SARAH ROGERS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #2 Exhibit A TO DECLARATION OF SARAH ROGERS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #3 Declaration OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #4 Exhibit A TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #5 Exhibit B TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #6 Exhibit C TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #7 Exhibit D TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #8 Exhibit E TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #9 Exhibit F TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #10 Exhibit G TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #11 Exhibit H TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #12 Exhibit I TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #13 Exhibit J TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #14 Exhibit K TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #15 Exhibit L TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #16 Exhibit M TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #17 Exhibit N TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #18 Exhibit O TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #19 Exhibit P TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #20 Exhibit Q TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #21 Exhibit R TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #22 Exhibit S TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, #23 Exhibit T TO DECLARATION OF CAROLYN B HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND)(Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gregg I. Shavitz. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Camar R. Jones. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand filed by Elizabeth Anderson, Jeffrey Bellows, Katherine Butler, Cheyenne Chitry, Christina Denton, Jacqueline Foster, Jorge Gonzalez, James Hancock, Donnie Hyso, Erik Lorack, Cassandra Sweeney, Michael Whiter. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 3/27/2020. Replies due by 4/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George R. Nemiroff in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 Plaintiffs' Responses to Special Interrogatories)(Wynne, Edward) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14268307.) filed by Elizabeth Anderson. (Jones, Camar) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
March 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14268277.) filed by Elizabeth Anderson. (Shavitz, Gregg) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/28/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 02/24/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Starbucks Corporation (White, Justin) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Starbucks Corporation.. (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 5/ 13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Starbucks Corporation. (White, Justin) (Filed on 2/18/2020) Modified on 2/19/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Starbucks Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Starbucks Corporation for Starbucks Corporation. (White, Justin) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/3/2020. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 14, 2020 #1 Answer to Removal Complaint by Starbucks Corporation. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION NOTICE OF REMOVAL (with jury demand by plaintiff) from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG19024868. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14183710). Filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Ex B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Ex C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Ex D to Notice of Removal, #5 Declaration of Carolyn B. Hall, #6 Exhibit Ex A to Carolyn B. Hall Declaration, #7 Exhibit Ex B to Carolyn B. Hall Declaration, #8 Exhibit Ex C to Carolyn B. Hall Declaration, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 2/14/2020) Modified on 2/19/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Denton
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Butler
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hancock
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Gonzalez
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Bellows
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Whiter
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Hyso
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheyenne Chitry
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Anderson
Represented By: Camar Ricardo Jones
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Sweeney
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Foster
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Lorack
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Carolyn Blecha Hall
Represented By: Douglas J. Farmer
Represented By: Brian Davis Berry
Represented By: Justin Coulter White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?