Lee v. Secretary of State of California
Plaintiff: Joselyn C. Lee
Defendant: Secretary of State of California
Case Number: 3:2020cv01203
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 03/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Joselyn C. Lee. Objections due by 4/7/2020. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 ECF 6 - Order Dismissing Complaint, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler denying #8 Ex Parte Application Petition for Transfer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re #1 Complaint filed by Joselyn C. Lee. Any Amended Complaint to be filed by 3/16/2020. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 02/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 Petition for Transfer (from San Francisco to Oakland District Court) filed by Joselyn C. Lee. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joselyn C. Lee. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER: The attached notice and order notifies the plaintiff of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk and instructs the plaintiff about serving the defendants. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 02/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Self Help Flyer, #3 Pro Se Handbook)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joselyn C. Lee. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) against Secretary of State of California. Filed byJoselyn C. Lee. Consent/Declination due by 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Secretary of State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joselyn C. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?