Prince v. Caviar, LLC
Petitioner: David Prince
Respondent: Caviar, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01292
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Prince (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER FINDING CASES ABERNATHY, ET AL. V. DOORDASH (CV 19-7545 WHA) AND PRINCE V. CAVIAR, LLC (CV 20-1292 RS) NOT RELATED.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/11/2020. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motion Hearing previously set for 4/9/2020 has been continued to 4/23/2020 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Briefing Deadline and Continue Motion Hearing. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/10/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Briefing Deadline and Continue Motion Hearing filed by David Prince. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE re #20 Order Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship by David Prince. (Lenkner, Travis) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE to #20 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship by Caviar, LLC. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 3/10/2020) Modified on 3/11/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2020 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by Caviar, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Doordash, Inc. for Caviar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service - Proof of Service)(Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Seth Lipshutz of Michael Holecek (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Seth Lipshutz of Theane Evangelis (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Seth Lipshutz (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) filed by Caviar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua Lipshutz in support of Respondent's Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Compel Arbitration)(Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/3/2020. Response due by 3/10/2020 at Noon. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration, Proposed Summons, Certification of Interested Parties, Motion to Compel Arbitration, Declaration of David Prince, Declaration of Travis Lenkner, Application for Admission of Travis Lenkner Pro Hac Vice, Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines, Summons, Order Granting Travis Lenkner Pro Hac Vice, Declination to Magistrate Judge, Order Reassigning Case, ECF Docket Image, Judge Seeborg's Standing Orders and Guidelines, Standing Order for all Judges, and Joint Case Management Statement and Proposed Order Form served on Caviar, LLC on 2020-02-27, filed by David Prince. (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 27, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2020 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 18 Renotice motion hearing re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed byDavid Prince. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/27/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an in-person Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 10:00 am in Courtroom #3, 17th Floor, in San Francisco before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. If either party so desires, however, counsel may file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am, in which case the Conference will be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically for all parties, and all parties must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Seeborg's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. The Clerk on 2/25/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Prince.. (Lenkner, Travis) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Travis Lenkner. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Caviar, LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/5/2020. No chambers copy is required. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/5/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14201309.) filed by David Prince. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lenkner, Travis) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 Declaration of Travis Lenkner in Support of #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed byDavid Prince. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 Declaration of David Prince in Support of #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed byDavid Prince. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by David Prince. Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Chambers before Judge ABC. Responses due by 3/5/2020. Replies due by 3/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by David Prince (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION to Compel Arbitration against Caviar, LLC (filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-14200951). Filed byDavid Prince. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zigler, Aaron) (Filed on 2/20/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince v. Caviar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Prince
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Caviar, LLC
Represented By: Theane Evangelis
Represented By: Michael J. Holecek
Represented By: Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?