California Natural Resources Agency et al v. Ross et al
Plaintiff: California Environmental Protection Agency, State of California by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra, California Natural Resources Agency and State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra
Defendant: David Bernhardt, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, Aurelia Skipwith, Brenda Burman, National Marine Fisheries Service, Secretary of Commerc Wilbur Ross, Chris Oliver and Wilbur Ross
Intervenor: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority and Westlands Water District
Intervenor Defendant: State Water Contractors
Case Number: 3:2020cv01299
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Remark: Case transferred from California Northernhas been opened in Eastern District of Californiaas case 1:20-cv-00426 (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 20, 2020 Remark: Case File Electronically Transferred to Eastern District of California. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE TO PARTIES. So that the parties do not have to do this, the court will fed ex to the Eastern District this afternoon the chambers copies of all pending motions and the pleadings (in both cases). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER.In the attached order, the court grants the motions to transfer and transfers the case (and the related case of California Natural Resources Agency v. Ross, No. 20-cv-01299-LB) to the Eastern District of California. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jenna Mandell-Rice representing Intervenor Defendant State Water Contractors. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Intervene filed by State Water Contractors. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 4/2/2020. Replies due by 4/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Pierre, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Answer)(McAdam, Allison) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14298213.) filed by State Water Contractors. (Mandell-Rice, Jenna) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 22 Statement PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE REGARDING PENDING MOTIONS TO TRANSFER IN RELATED CASE PCFFA v. ROSS, No. 3:19-cv-7897 by California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency, State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra. (Van Loh, Sara) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Rachel Jacobson representing Intervenor Westlands Water District. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED DOCUMENT by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. Amendment to #13 MOTION to Intervene Amended [Proposed] Order. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Natural Resources Agency.. (Fuchs, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14264488.) filed by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District.. (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 16 Declaration of Rebecca L. Harms in Support of #13 MOTION to Intervene filed bySan Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #13 ) (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 15 Declaration of William R. Freeman in Support of #13 MOTION to Intervene filed bySan Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #13 ) (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 14 Declaration of Pablo Arroyave in Support of #13 MOTION to Intervene filed bySan Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #13 ) (O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Intervene filed by San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority, Westlands Water District. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 3/24/2020. Replies due by 3/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Answer)(O'Hanlon, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/24/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Laurel Beeler upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Laurel Beeler's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 9, 2020 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RELATING CASE. The court finds that the cases are related C19-7897 LB and C20-1299 DMR. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/09/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen R. Flannery (Flannery, Colleen) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Elizabeth Sarine as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Sarine, Lisa) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Lynn Winsor as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Winsor, Tracy) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Fuchs (Fuchs, Daniel) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to David Bernhardt, Brenda Burman, National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilbur Ross, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/6/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Van Loh, Sara) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14201648.). Filed byState of California by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra, California Environmental Protection Agency, California Natural Resources Agency. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Loh, Sara) (Filed on 2/20/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Natural Resources Agency et al v. Ross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Sara Dena Van Loh
Represented By: Lisa Elizabeth Sarine
Represented By: Daniel M. Fuchs
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Winsor
Represented By: Colleen R. Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Sara Dena Van Loh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Natural Resources Agency
Represented By: Sara Dena Van Loh
Represented By: Lisa Elizabeth Sarine
Represented By: Daniel M. Fuchs
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Winsor
Represented By: Colleen R. Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California by and through California Attorney General Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Sara Dena Van Loh
Represented By: Lisa Elizabeth Sarine
Represented By: Daniel M. Fuchs
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Winsor
Represented By: Colleen R. Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Reclamation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurelia Skipwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Burman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Commerc Wilbur Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Westlands Water District
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Represented By: Rachel Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State Water Contractors
Represented By: Jenna Mandell-Rice
Represented By: Allison Elaine McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?