Californians for Alternatives to Toxics v. Kernen Construction Co. et al
Plaintiff: Californians for Alternatives to Toxics
Defendant: Bedrock Investments LLC, Kernen Construction Co., Kurt Kernen and Scott Farley
Case Number: 3:2020cv01348
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jackson, Allison) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Packard, Andrew) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byBedrock Investments LLC, Scott Farley, Kurt Kernen, Kernen Construction Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Answer, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Answer, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Answer, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Answer, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Answer, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Answer, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Answer, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Answer, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Answer, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Answer, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Answer)(Jackson, Allison) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, etc. served on Scott Farley on March 13, 2020, filed by Californians for Alternatives to Toxics. (Packard, Andrew) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, etc. served on Kurt Kernen on March 13, 2020, filed by Californians for Alternatives to Toxics. (Packard, Andrew) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, etc. served on Bedrock Investments on March 13, 2020, filed by Californians for Alternatives to Toxics. (Packard, Andrew) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, etc. served on Kernen Construction Co on March 13, 2020, filed by Californians for Alternatives to Toxics. (Packard, Andrew) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Californians for Alternatives to Toxics (Packard, Andrew) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Bedrock Investments LLC, Scott Farley, Kurt Kernen, Kernen Construction Co. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. (Packard, Andrew) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/28/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 2/27/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Californians for Alternatives to Toxics.. (Carlon, William) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Correction of Clerical Error regarding venue. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 02/25/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020) Modified on 2/25/2020 (mbcS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Californians for Alternatives to Toxics (Revised, Using Form JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 7/19)). (Packard, Andrew) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 25, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 7/19) [err101]. Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. Re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Californians for Alternatives to Toxics (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/9/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Californians for Alternatives to Toxics . (Packard, Andrew) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND CIVIL PENALTIES against All Defendants (no process) ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14206614.). Filed by Californians for Alternatives to Toxics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Clean Water Act Notice)(Packard, Andrew) (Filed on 2/21/2020) Modified on 2/25/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Californians for Alternatives to Toxics v. Kernen Construction Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bedrock Investments LLC
Represented By: Allison Grace Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kernen Construction Co.
Represented By: Allison Grace Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Kernen
Represented By: Allison Grace Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Farley
Represented By: Allison Grace Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Californians for Alternatives to Toxics
Represented By: Andrew L. Packard
Represented By: David Hutchings Williams
Represented By: William Leonard Verick
Represented By: William Nazar Carlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?