Guida v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Fabian Ernesto Guida
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, Acting Director Chad Wolf, Loren K Miller, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad Wolf, Loren K. Miller and Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Case Number: 3:2020cv01471
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Fabian Ernesto Guida. Amended Civil Case Cover Sheet. (Gee, Michelle) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/30/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa Molina (Molina, Vanessa) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
March 11, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fabian Ernesto Guida.. (Gee, Michelle) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
March 9, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #9 Certificate of Service filed by Fabian Ernesto Guida (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Fabian Ernesto Guida. U.S. Attorney served on 3/4/20, answer due 5/4/20. (Gee, Michelle) (Filed on 3/6/2020) Modified on 3/9/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Loren K. Miller, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf.(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Gee, Michelle) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fabian Ernesto Guida Certificate of Interested Persons (Gee, Michelle) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2020. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Gee, Michelle) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Loren K Miller, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14226789.). Filed byFabian Ernesto Guida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gee, Michelle) (Filed on 2/27/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guida v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Vanessa Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren K Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship & Immigration Services
Represented By: Vanessa Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Vanessa Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren K. Miller
Represented By: Vanessa Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Vanessa Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian Ernesto Guida
Represented By: Michelle Skatoff Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?