Xiaohou v. Cuccinelli et al
Plaintiff: Yu Xiahou and Yu Xiaohou
Defendant: Nicholas Colucci, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad Wolf and Anne Arries Corsano
Case Number: 3:2020cv01603
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S Hixson granting #10 Stipulation to Extend Dates:Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2020. Defendant's Answer due: 10/9/2020.(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Dates filed by Nicholas Colucci, Anne Arries Corsano, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad Wolf. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nicholas Colucci, Anne Arries Corsano, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad Wolf.. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Yu Xiaohou.. (Martin, Eric) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Joseph Martin (Martin, Eric) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Yu Xiaohou of re #1 Complaint (Martin, Eric) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Defendants Nicholas Colucci, Anne Arries Corsano, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli & Chad Wolf. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Martin, Eric) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/18/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus and Declaratory Judgment, (Filing Fee Paid of $400.00, Receipt# 0971-14245869) against All Defendants. Filed by Yu Xiaohou. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Eric) (Filed on 3/4/2020) Modified on 3/4/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/6/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xiaohou v. Cuccinelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yu Xiahou
Represented By: Eric Joseph Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yu Xiaohou
Represented By: Eric Joseph Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Colucci
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Arries Corsano
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?