Boal et al v. Schoenmann
Appellee: E. Lynn Schoenmann
Appellant: Steven R. Boal and Quotient Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01610
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of Recommendation regarding Motion to withdraw the Reference by Judge Montali. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2020: #1 Docket sheet, #2 Motion to withdraw reference, #3 Transmittal) (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE HEARING FROM 4/23/2020 TO 5/28/2020 RE #1 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #1 Withdrawal of Reference, #4 Response ( Non Motion ) ISO Motion to Withdraw Reference by Steven R. Boal. (Peters, Elliot) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
March 20, 2020 Please ignore the deadline just sent - filed in error. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE re #3 Notice (Other) re Withdrawal of Reference by E. Lynn Schoenmann. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice with Exhibit A)(Meade, Tyler) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 6, 2020 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. PLEASE DISREGARD *** Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 : Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Vince Chhabria. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Steven R. Boal re #1 Withdrawal of Reference, (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Peters, Elliot) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE to counsel re Notice of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 Withdrawal of Bankruptcy Reference Upon Order of the Court. Bankruptcy Court case number 08-30119 DM, Adv# 20-03007. Filed bySteven R. Boal, Quotient Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of documents, #2 Docket sheet)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boal et al v. Schoenmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: E. Lynn Schoenmann
Represented By: Seena Forouzan
Represented By: Tyler Roberts Meade
Represented By: Samuel Ivan Ferguson
Represented By: Anne Orelind Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Steven R. Boal
Represented By: Brook Dooley
Represented By: Elliot Remsen Peters
Represented By: Victor T. Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Quotient Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew David Caplan
Represented By: David Samuel Houska
Represented By: Jayme Breanna Staten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?