Armstrong Flooring, Inc. v. Wilson
Plaintiff: Armstrong Flooring, Inc.
Defendant: Gregory Wilson
Case Number: 3:2020cv01623
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike #13 Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(f); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 5/13/2020. Replies due by 5/20/2020. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Forman, Dan) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 13 Verified ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint with Jury Trial Demand filed by Gregory Wilson. (Davis, Yvette) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
March 30, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Armstrong Flooring, Inc. of re 8 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only, re #11 Case Management Scheduling Order, re #9 Order (Forman, Dan) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/23/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Armstrong Flooring, Inc. of re #6 Summons Issued, re 4 Case Assigned by Intake, re #1 Complaint, re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, re #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Forman, Dan) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 3/19/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020) Modified on 3/19/2020 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Armstrong Flooring, Inc... (Forman, Dan) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defendant Gregory Wilson. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2020 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/19/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Forman, Dan) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Forman, Dan) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for: (1) Breach of Contract, (2) Unjust Enrichment and (3) Conversion; Demand for Jury Trial against Defendant Gregory Wilson, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14250240). Filed by Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Forman, Dan) (Filed on 3/5/2020) Modified on 3/9/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong Flooring, Inc. v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Wilson
Represented By: Yvette Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armstrong Flooring, Inc.
Represented By: Dan Mark Forman
Represented By: Allison Ocampo Chua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?