KQED INC. v. United States Customs and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: KQED INC.
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Customs and Immigration Services
Case Number: 3:2020cv01628
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Customs and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security.. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint to May 26, 2020 filed by United States Customs and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States Customs and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by KQED INC... (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by KQED INC. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2020 01:30 PM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/20/2020. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. section 552 et seq. against United States Customs and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14251197.). Filed byKQED INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/5/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KQED INC. v. United States Customs and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Shiwon Choe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Immigration Services
Represented By: Shiwon Choe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KQED INC.
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?