The Center for Investigative Reporting et al v. United States Department of Commerce
Plaintiff: The Center for Investigative Reporting and Will Carless
Defendant: U.S. Department of Commerce and United States Department of Commerce
Case Number: 3:2020cv01783
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #9 Stipulation To Set Response Date. Deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 5/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 6/11/2020 is reset to 7/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of Commerce.. (Bernardoni, Jevechius) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO SET RESPONSE DATE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by United States Department of Commerce. (Bernardoni, Jevechius) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Will Carless, The Center for Investigative Reporting re #1 Complaint, (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/16/2020)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Will Carless, The Center for Investigative Reporting.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/16/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defendant United States Department of Commerce. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/4/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/26/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Will Carless & The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against United States Department of Commerce, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971- 14275379). Filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting & Will Carless. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit, #(2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/12/2020) Modified on 3/13/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Center for Investigative Reporting et al v. United States Department of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Center for Investigative Reporting
Represented By: Diana Victoria Baranetsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Will Carless
Represented By: Diana Victoria Baranetsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Commerce
Represented By: Jevechius Doherty Bernardoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?