Verhines v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Spencer VERHINES and Christopher James
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01886
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 81 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/6/2020. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 10:30 AM. See pdf image for further details.Total Time in Court: 30 Minutes. Court Reporter: Marla Knox. ,br>Plaintiff Attorney: Shannon Liss-Riordan. Defendant Attorneys: Theane Evangelis, Blaine Evanson, Heather Richardson. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting (51) Stipulation Regarding Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Complaint. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-06462-EMC, 3:20-cv-01886-EMC.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 78 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM WEBINAR HEARING FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET 5/6/2020 AT 10:30 AM. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/81203139581?pwd=V2NVTnIySW5OSzkwYVpSdGN5R2tVZz09Meeting ID: 812-0313-9581Password: 010900Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. Th ere is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 77 STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 5/1/2020) Modified on 5/6/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2020 Filing 76 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 75 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 22, 2020 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Christopher James, Spencer Verhines, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 74 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-22-2020, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (47 in 3:20-cv-01886-EMC) Transcript Order, (47 in 3:19-cv-06462-EMC) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 27, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2020 10:30 AM. via ZOOM Webinar. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Proceedings held via Zoom Webinar. Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/22/2020; Motion Hearing held on 4/22/2020 in case 3:19-cv-06462-EMC. Court takes matter under submission. Further Case Management Conference set 5/6/2020 at 10:30 AM and will proceed via Zoom Webinar. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 4/30/2020. See pdf image for further details.Total Time in Court: 1 Hour. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Shannon Liss-Riordan, Anne Kramer. Defendant Attorneys: Theane Evangelis, Heather Richardson, Blaine Evanson. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 72 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Docket 17) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 71 RESPONSE re 68 Clerk's Notice, allowing responses to Mr. Mendel's amicus curiae brief (Dkt. 65) by Christopher James, Spencer Verhines. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 70 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Settlement Conference, via Zoom, held on 4/21/2020. Court to set further settlement conference. FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Anne Kramer, Shannon-Liss-Riordan (by video conference) Attorney for Defendant: Theane Evangelis, Heather Richardson, Michele Maryott (by video conference)(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 69 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING HEARINGS SCHEDULED ON 4/22/2020, AT 10:00 A.M., TO A ZOOM WEBINAR; REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL IN ADVANCE REQUIRED, SEE BELOW.Pre-registration by counsel with the clerk in advance of the hearings must be done by emailing a list of names of counsel who will be participating in the CMC to emccrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than Tuesday, April 21, 2020, at 5:00 PM, PST.All counsel, public, and press will join the webinar as attendees and be able to see and hear what is going on throughout all of the proceedings, but will not be able to actually participate in the proceedings until the Court switches them over to a participant. Before each case is called, counsel who have pre-registered with the clerk in advance of the hearing will be converted from attendee to participant. The links provided in the attached PDF image are for all counsel, members of the public and press to use for accessing the hearing on April 22, 2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020) Modified on 4/21/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2020 Filing 68 CLERK'S NOTICE: Mr. Mendel's request for leave to file an amicus curiae brief (Docket No. #65 ) is granted. To the extent the parties wish to respond to Mr. Mendel's brief, any such responses are due by 5pm on Tuesday, April 21 and are limited to 4 pages. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 67 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Settlement Conference (via Zoom) held on 4/16/2020. Further Settlement Conference (via Zoom) set for 4/21/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Anne Kramer, Shannon-Liss-Riordan (by video conference) Attorney for Defendant: Theane Evangelis, Heather Richardson, Michele Maryott (by video conference)(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 64 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated against Uber Technologies, Inc.. Filed bySpencer Verhines, Christopher James. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Settlement Conference (by video conference) held on 4/14/2020. Further Settlement Conference (by Zoom) set for 4/16/2020 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Anne Kramer, Shannon-Liss-Riordan (by video conference)Attorney for Defendant: Theane Evangelis, Heather Richardson, Michele Maryott (by video conference)(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/14/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 66 Request for Judicial Notice filed by S. Patrick Mendel . (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020) Modified on 4/17/2020 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2020 Filing 65 REQUEST for leave to file amicus curiae brief and amicus curiae brief filed by S. Patrick Mendel. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020) Modified on 4/17/2020 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2020 Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Settlement Conference (by video conference) held on 4/10/2020. Further Settlement Conference (by video conference) set for 4/14/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor.FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Anne Kramer, Shannon-Liss-Riordan (by video conference) Attorney for Defendant: Theane Evangelis, Heather Richardson, Michele Maryott (by video conference)(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Settlement Conference (by video conference) held on 4/9/2020 at 1:00 PM. Further Settlement Conference (by video conference) set for 4/10/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Anne Kramer, Shannon-Liss-Riordan (by video conference)Attorney for Defendant: Theane Evangelis, Heather Richardson, Michele Maryott (by video conference)(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/10/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 60 AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Settlement Conference (by video conference) held on 4/9/2020. Further Settlement Conference (by video conference) continued to 4/9/2020 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor.FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Anne Kramer, Shannon-Liss-Riordan (by video conference) Attorney for Defendant: Theane Evangelis, Heather Richardson, Michele Maryott (by video conference)Amended to correct time.FTR Time: Not Reported. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/9/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Settlement Conference (by video conference) held on 4/9/2020. Further Settlement Conference (by video conference) continued to 4/9/2020 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor.FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Anne Kramer, Shannon-Liss-Riordan (by video conference) Attorney for Defendant: Theane Evangelis, Heather Richardson, Michele Maryott (by video conference)(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/9/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Settlement Conference held on 4/8/2020. Further Settlement Conference set for 4/9/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Anne Kramer, Shannon-Liss-Riordan (by video conference)Attorney for Defendant: Theane Evangelis, Heather Richardson, Michele Maryott (by video conference)(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/8/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 55 EXHIBITS re #54 Notice (Other) re Supplemental Authorities in Support of #28 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #54 ) (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Settlement Conference held on 4/6/2020. Further Settlement Conference set for 4/8/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Anne Kramer, Shannon-Liss-Riordan (by video conference)Attorney for Defendant: Theane Evangelis, Heather Richardson, Michele Maryott (by video conference)(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Settlement Conference held on 4/6/2020. Further settlement conference set for 4/6/2020 at 4:00 PM. FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Anne Kramer, Shannon-Liss-Riordan (by video conference) Attorney for Defendant: Theane Evangelis, Heather Richardson, Michele Maryott (by video conference)(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. re #28 Opposition/Response to Motion (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 53 Declaration of Carrol Chang in Support of #46 Motion Hearing,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, (Response for a Supplemental Declaration) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) #46 ) (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 52 Letter from T. Evangelis and S. Liss-Riordan Joint letter re Status of Settlement Discussions and Likelihood of Resolution. (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 51 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/01/2020, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #47 Transcript Order, #48 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2020. (Related documents(s) #47 , #48 ) (rreS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 50 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/01/2020 before Judge Edward M. Chen for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 49 CLERK'S NOTICE Telephone Conference set for 4/6/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Chambers before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Parties will be notified in a separate email with conference call information. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 48 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/01/2020 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 1, 2020 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Christopher James, Spencer Verhines, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 1, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 4/1/2020 taking under submission #17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Letter brief due 4/3/2020; case ordered consolidated with 3:19-cv-6462-EMC, Colopy et al v. Uber Technologies; Briefing schedule set in related case 20-cv-2211-EMC, Capriole v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al. Telephonic Motion Hearing set in that case for 4/22/2020 at 10:00 a.m. Case Referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for settlement conference. Further Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/22/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, before Judge Edward M. Chen. See pdf image for further details and instruction.Total Time in Court: 2 Hours; 5 Minutes. Court Reporter: Ruth Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorneys: Anne Kramer, Shannon Liss-Riordan. Defendant Attorneys: Theane Evangelis, Blaine Evanson, Heather Lynn Richardson. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/1/2020) Modified on 4/1/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case 20-cv-2211-TSH, Capriole v. Uber, is related. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/1/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/1/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE by Christopher James, Spencer Verhines of Filing of Notice of Related Case in Case 19-cv-06462 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: First Amended Complaint (Capriole D.Mass), #2 Exhibit B: Memo and Order allowing Transfer)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR PARTIES TO REVIEW PRIOR TO HEARING SET APRIL 1, 2020 AT 10:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/31/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING IMPORTANT CALL-IN INFORMATION FOR HEARING SET TOMORROW, APRIL 1, 2020, AT 10:00 A.M.: Parties are to call into the hearing on AT&T Conference line: 1-888-684-8852, access code: 6662706; press * to bypass security code. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 30, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY (re #17 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) (Corrected) filed byChristopher James, Spencer Verhines. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 30, 2020 Filing 39 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) (Surreply) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Chang)(Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 29, 2020 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE: As the Complaint in this matter has been amended as a matter of right pursuant to F.R.C.P. 15(a)(1), Plaintiff Christopher James' declaration submitted in support of Plaintiffs' reply will be considered. Defendant may file a brief (not to exceed 3 pages) sur-reply addressing that declaration by noon, Monday, March 30, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2020)
March 27, 2020 Filing 37 Declaration of Shannon Liss-Riordan in Support of #35 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byChristopher James, Spencer Verhines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Decl. of Shannon Liss-Riordan, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Decl. of Shannon Liss-Riordan, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Decl. of Shannon Liss-Riordan, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Decl. of Shannon Liss-Riordan, #5 Exhibit Ex.5 to Decl. of Shannon Liss-Riordan, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Decl. of Shannon Liss-Riordan, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Decl. of Shannon Liss-Riordan, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 to Decl of Shannon Liss-Riordan, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 to Decl. of Shannon Liss-Riordan, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10 to Decl. of Shannon Liss-Riordan, #11 Exhibit Ex. A - F to Decl. of Chris James)(Related document(s) #35 ) (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 27, 2020 Filing 36 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) (Supplemental Opposition) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Schurman)(Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 27, 2020 Filing 35 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - SEE DOC #40 REPLY (re #17 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byChristopher James, Spencer Verhines. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/27/2020) Modified on 3/31/2020 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2020 Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING TELEPHONIC INSTRUCTIONS FOR PARTIES AND MEDIA FOR HEARING SET 4/1/2020 AT 10:00 A.M.: Parties are to contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make arrangements to appear. Media is to contact the Court's Media Liason, Nicholas_Jackson@cand.uscourts.gov, for call-in information. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE: Uber is permitted to file a supplemental brief of no more than three pages responding to anything new in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Docket No. #27 ). Any such brief must be filed by 11:59 pm on Friday, March 27, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 32 Declaration of THEANE EVANGELIS in Support of #28 Opposition/Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #28 ) (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 31 Declaration of JUSTIN MCCRARY in Support of #28 Opposition/Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) #28 ) (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 30 Declaration of DR. ANNE W. RIMOIN in Support of #28 Opposition/Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #28 ) (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 29 Declaration of BRAD ROSENTHAL in Support of #28 Opposition/Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #28 ) (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 28 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Uber Technologies, Inc.. Filed bySpencer Verhines, Christopher James. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 26 Case Reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Judge Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 22, 2020 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE RE #17 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 3/25/2020. Replies due by 3/27/2020. TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Parties to make arrangements through Court Call. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2020) Modified on 3/22/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case 19-cv-6462-EMC, Colopy v. Uber Technologies, Inc., related. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/22/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2020)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 3/20/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 22 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Spencer Verhines.. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Uber Technologies, Inc... (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/20/2020 at 4:00 PM. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 17 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Spencer Verhines. Responses due by 4/2/2020. Replies due by 4/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order EMERGENCY Motion, #2 Declaration ISO EMERGENCY Motion)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr for Uber Technologies, Inc. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Seth Lipshutz for Uber Technologies, Inc. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine H. Evanson for Uber Technologies, Inc. (Evanson, Blaine) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne R. Kramer as attorney for Plaintiff Spencer Verhines (Kramer, Anne) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Liss-Riordan as attorney for the Plaintiff Spencer Verhines (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. re 9 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/ 12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/1/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, was filed in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #5 Notice (Other), #6 Notice of Appearance, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Lynn Richardson (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Corrected) (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - SEE DOC #5 NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/17/2020) Modified on 3/18/2020 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Uber Technologies, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate SoftBank Group Corp., Other Affiliate SB Cayman 2 Ltd. for Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Uber Technologies, Inc. . (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Class Action Complaint from Superior Court of California, Cty of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-20-583684. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14289941). Filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of B. Rosenthal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verhines v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer VERHINES
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Anne R. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher James
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Anne R. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Theane Evangelis
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Blaine H. Evanson
Represented By: Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?