United States v. One Parcel of Real Estate Property
Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: One Parcel of Real Propetry Located at 9414 Plaza Point Drive, Missouri City, Texas, 77459
Claimant: Rowland Marcus Andrade, Solmaz Andrade and WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB as trustee for IRP FUND II TRUST 2A
Case Number: 3:2020cv02013
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1341
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Declaration of Publication) (Kaltsas, Chris) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 5/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 18 Claimant's ANSWER to Complaint for Civil Forfeiture In Rem with Jury Demand filed by Rowland Marcus Andrade. (Andrade, Rowland) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. Copy of this notice emailed to Rowland Andrade at dojreform@protonmail.com. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020) Modified on 5/18/2020 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Rowland Marcus Andrade. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 15 Letter from Solmaz Andrade. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 Letter from Rowland Marcus Andrade. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Solmaz Andrade.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rowland Marcus Andrade.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020) Modified on 5/18/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2020 Filing 11 CLAIM of Interest in Real Property byWILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB as trustee for IRP FUND II TRUST 2A. (Ascherin, Preston) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 VERIFIED CLAIM for Seized Property byRowland Marcus Andrade. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 VERIFIED CLAIM for Seized Property bySolmaz Andrade. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #5 Notice (Other), #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Lis Pendens, #7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Kaltsas, Chris) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Kaltsas, Chris) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 Recorded NOTICE of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens) as to Real Property and Improvements Located at 9414 Plaza Point Drive Missouri City, Texas, 77459 (APN R464507) by Chris Kaltsas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kaltsas, Chris) (Filed on 4/2/2020) Modified on 4/3/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Kaltsas, Chris) (Filed on 3/30/2020) Modified on 3/31/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by United States . (Kaltsas, Chris) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet JS 44 (Rev. 09/19) used at case opening. Please complete and re-file as a s eparate docket entry current Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19). re #1 . #1 Complaint, filed by United States (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/6/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified Complaint for Civil Forfeiture IN REM) against One Parcel of Real Propetry Located at 9414 Plaza Point Drive, Missouri City, Texas, 77459. Filed by United States ( Filing Fee Waived) . (No Process) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaltsas, Chris) (Filed on 3/23/2020) Modified on 3/23/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/24/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. One Parcel of Real Estate Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Chris Kaltsas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Chris Kaltsas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Parcel of Real Propetry Located at 9414 Plaza Point Drive, Missouri City, Texas, 77459
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rowland Marcus Andrade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Solmaz Andrade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB as trustee for IRP FUND II TRUST 2A
Represented By: Preston Konow Ascherin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?