Vivance v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Aristide Vivance
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv02056
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00816. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order of MDL Transfer to District of Northern District of California. MDL case number is 2741. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(am)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2741. (am)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Monsanto Company served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Geiger, Andrew)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (am)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8204924) filed by Aristide Vivance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Andrew J. Geiger added to party Aristide Vivance(pty:pla).(Geiger, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vivance v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aristide Vivance
Represented By: Allan Berger
Represented By: Andrew J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?