Huffman v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Virginia Huffman
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv02061
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:20-cv-00130. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (EDC)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 CTO Order)(EDC)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel (Attachments: #1 Minute Order) (SWE)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (KMW)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2086523.), filed by Virginia Huffman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons)(Fore, Colt) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/9/2020 to flatten the document) (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huffman v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Huffman
Represented By: Hannah Elayne Honeycutt
Represented By: Colt Justin Fore
Represented By: D. Blayne Honeycutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?