He v. Ouyang et al
Plaintiff: Shui He
Defendant: Fangfang Ouyang, Vepo Design Consulting LLC, Li Chen and Vepo Design Consulting, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv02066
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by Vepo Design Consulting, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/8/2020. Replies due by 6/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration)(Liu, Zheng) (Filed on 5/25/2020)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint by Judge William H. Orrick granting #13 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/21/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation for extension of time to file responsive pleading filed by Shui He. (Zhu, Keliang) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #9 Objection by Fangfang Ouyang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fangfang Ouyang, #2 Declaration of Counsel)(Liu, Zheng) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 04/03/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS to Stipulation for extension of time to file responsive pleading by Shui He. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Zhu, Keliang) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shui He.. (Zhu, Keliang) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, stipulation to a first extension of 60 days to file responsive pleading filed by Fangfang Ouyang. (Liu, Zheng) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fangfang Ouyang.. (Liu, Zheng) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/8/2020. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fangfang Ouyang (Liu, Zheng) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Fangfang Ouyang . (Liu, Zheng) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa. Their case number is C20-00069. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14311324). Filed byFangfang Ouyang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Liu, Zheng) (Filed on 3/24/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: He v. Ouyang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shui He
Represented By: Yi Yao
Represented By: Keliang Zhu
Represented By: Jeffrey Louis Fazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fangfang Ouyang
Represented By: Zheng Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vepo Design Consulting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Li Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vepo Design Consulting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?