Widener et al v. General Electric Company et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Widener and Verlene Widener
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC (fka Foster Wheeler Corporation), General Electric Company, CBS Corporation (fka Viacom Inc., fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation), Crane Co., Foster Wheeler LLC and CBS Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv02076
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 33 Defendant Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants byCrane Co.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, And to Add Defendant filed by Arthur Widener. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 6/3/2020. Replies due by 6/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Donadio, David) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arthur Widener, Verlene Widener for Defendant FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION (Donadio, David) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arthur Widener, Verlene Widener for Defendant CBS CORPORATION (FKA VIACOM INC., FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION) (Donadio, David) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arthur Widener, Verlene Widener for Defendant GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Donadio, David) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arthur Widener, Verlene Widener for Defendant CRANE CO. (Donadio, David) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Anselmo, Emily) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent ViacomCBS, Inc., Other Affiliate National Amusement, Inc., Other Affiliate Viacom Inc., fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation for CBS Corporation. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by CBS Corporation (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCBS Corporation. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Crane Co. to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Crane Co.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Anselmo, Emily) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGeneral Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Foster Wheeler LLC.. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Foster Wheeler LLC re #8 Answer to Complaint NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1; L.R. 3-15) (Park, Charles) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Park DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER (Park, Charles) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Foster Wheeler LLC re #8 Answer to Complaint (Park, Charles) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS ANSWER to Complaint FOR ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY/PRODUCTS LIABILITY/LOSS OF CONSORTIUM byFoster Wheeler LLC. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2020 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to CBS Corporation (fka Viacom Inc., fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation), Crane Co., Foster Wheeler LLC (fka Foster Wheeler Corporation), General Electric Company. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Donadio, David) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Arthur Widener, Verlene Widener (Donadio, David) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Arthur Widener, Verlene Widener.. (Donadio, David) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Asbestos Personal Injury/Products Liability/Loss of Consortium; Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14313790.). Filed byVerlene Widener, Arthur Widener. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donadio, David) (Filed on 3/25/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Widener et al v. General Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC (fka Foster Wheeler Corporation)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation (fka Viacom Inc., fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Widener
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verlene Widener
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?