Roya v. Everport-Evergreen Terminal Services et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Roya
Defendant: Kenneth Green, Ron Chesly, Everport-Evergreen Terminal Services, Michael Andrews, Marcus Davis, Tra-Pac Terminal Services, Brian Tilly, Pacific Maritime Association, Edward Henderson and Randy Solomon
Case Number: 3:2020cv02108
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER CLARIFYING DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/14/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 13, 2020 Filing 26 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Pacific Maritime Association. Amendment to #25 Order on Motion to Dismiss, [Pacific Maritime Association's Request for Amended Order on Motion to Dismiss]. (Baltazar, Ashley) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #22 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 24, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pacific Maritime Association re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Baltazar, Ashley) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 23 ERRATA re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Michael Andrews, Ron Chesly, Marcus Davis, Everport-Evergreen Terminal Services, Kenneth Green, Edward Henderson, Pacific Maritime Association, Randy Solomon, Brian Tilly, Tra-Pac Terminal Services. (Baltazar, Ashley) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Michael Andrews, Ron Chesly, Marcus Davis, Everport-Evergreen Terminal Services, Kenneth Green, Edward Henderson, Pacific Maritime Association, Randy Solomon, Brian Tilly, Tra-Pac Terminal Services. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 5/8/2020. Replies due by 5/15/2020. (Baltazar, Ashley) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 15, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pacific Maritime Association (Baltazar, Ashley) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Bulfer and Brigham Cheney (Bulfer, Daniel) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an in-person Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom #3, 17th Floor, in San Francisco before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2020. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. If either party so desires, however, counsel may file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am, in which case the Conference will be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically for all parties, and all parties must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Seeborg's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020) (cl, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RELATING CASES 18-6141 RS and 20-2108 WHO. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/7/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2020: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cl, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to the case. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 18 OBJECTIONS to by Kevin Roya. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pacific Maritime Association re #14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Baltazar, Ashley) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 Request for Judicial Notice re #14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed byPacific Maritime Association. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Baltazar, Ashley) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Michael Andrews, Ron Chesly, Marcus Davis, Everport-Evergreen Terminal Services, Kenneth Green, Edward Henderson, Pacific Maritime Association. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/16/2020. Replies due by 4/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint)(Baltazar, Ashley) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/02/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pacific Maritime Association (Baltazar, Ashley) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Pacific Maritime Association Notice of Related Cases (Baltazar, Ashley) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 03/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pacific Maritime Association.. (Baltazar, Ashley) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 03/27/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 2/27/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2020: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/ 18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/10/2020. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pacific Maritime Association re #1 Notice of Removal, (Baltazar, Ashley) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pacific Maritime Association re #1 Notice of Removal, (Baltazar, Ashley) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG18919342. (). Filed byPacific Maritime Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Declaration of Samuel Rice in Support of Defendant Pacific Maritime Association's Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baltazar, Ashley) (Filed on 3/26/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roya v. Everport-Evergreen Terminal Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Chesly
Represented By: Ashley Adrianne Baltazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everport-Evergreen Terminal Services
Represented By: Brigham McAllister Cheney
Represented By: Daniel J Bulfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Andrews
Represented By: Brigham McAllister Cheney
Represented By: Daniel J Bulfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Davis
Represented By: Brigham McAllister Cheney
Represented By: Daniel J Bulfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tra-Pac Terminal Services
Represented By: Ashley Adrianne Baltazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Maritime Association
Represented By: Ashley Adrianne Baltazar
Represented By: Eric Meckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Solomon
Represented By: Ashley Adrianne Baltazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Roya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?