Druzbik v. Went et al
Plaintiff: James Druzbik
Defendant: Mardi C. Dier, Richard A. King, Adamas Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Michael F. Bigham, John MacPhee, William W. Ericson, David L. Mahoney, Gregory T. Went, Ivan Lieberburg, Martha J. Demski and Alfred G. Merriweather
Case Number: 3:2020cv02320
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Cases associated: 3:20-cv-01815-RS consolidated with 3:20-cv-2320-RS (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED DERIVATIVE ACTIONS AND APPOINT CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND COUNSEL, AND STAY DERIVATIVE ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/18/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an in-person Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom #3, 17th Floor, in San Francisco before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2020. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. If either party so desires, however, counsel may file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am, in which case the Conference will be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically for all parties, and all parties must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 5/12/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Edward Gibbs (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adamas Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Michael F. Bigham, Martha J. Demski, Mardi C. Dier, William W. Ericson, Richard A. King, Ivan Lieberburg, John MacPhee, David L. Mahoney, Alfred G. Merriweather, Gregory T. Went.. (Brien, Tijana) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Tijana Martinovic Brien (Brien, Tijana) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq (Eagan, Shannon) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that an Initial Case Management Conference is set for 6/16/2020 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. A case management statement is due by 6/9/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 5/12/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER. The Court finds that cases 20-cv-1815 KAW and 20-cv-2320 JCS are related. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/27/20. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by James Druzbik of Filing of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related in 4:20-cv-01815 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Druzbik. Adamas Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020. (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Adamas Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Michael F. Bigham, Martha J. Demski, Mardi C. Dier, William W. Ericson, Richard A. King, Ivan Lieberburg, John MacPhee, David L. Mahoney, Alfred G. Merriweather, Gregory T. Went. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/21/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by James Druzbik (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adamas Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Michael F. Bigham, Martha J. Demski, Mardi C. Dier, William W. Ericson, Richard A. King, Ivan Lieberburg, John MacPhee, David L. Mahoney, Alfred G. Merriweather, Gregory T. Went ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14346121.). Filed byJames Druzbik. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 4/6/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Druzbik v. Went et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mardi C. Dier
Represented By: Tijana Martinovic Brien
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. King
Represented By: Tijana Martinovic Brien
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adamas Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Tijana Martinovic Brien
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Bigham
Represented By: Tijana Martinovic Brien
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John MacPhee
Represented By: Tijana Martinovic Brien
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William W. Ericson
Represented By: Tijana Martinovic Brien
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Mahoney
Represented By: Tijana Martinovic Brien
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory T. Went
Represented By: Tijana Martinovic Brien
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan Lieberburg
Represented By: Tijana Martinovic Brien
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha J. Demski
Represented By: Tijana Martinovic Brien
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred G. Merriweather
Represented By: Tijana Martinovic Brien
Represented By: Patrick Edward Gibbs
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Druzbik
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?