Steinberg v. Robinhood Markets, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Steinberg
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC and Robinhood Securities, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv02343
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/22/2020. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASES. The Court has consolidated the related actions for all pre-trial proceedings and designated the lowest-numbered case, Case No. 3:20-cv-01626-JD, as the lead case. Dkt. No. 59. All underlying cases will be closed by the Clerk, other than Case No. 3:20-cv-3550-JD, in which a motion to remand is pending. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/15/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION AND INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/14/2020. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Noorjahan Rahman (Rahman, Noorjahan) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 Case reassigned to Judge James Donato. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Relate Cases and Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding filed by Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 13, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Re: #6 Notice (Other) filed by Robinhood Securities, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc.. This fi ling will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety by using the event motion to relate case. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 Certification of Interested Entities filed by Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Robinhood Financial LLC, Other Affiliate Robinhood Securities, LLC, Other Affiliate Baiju Bhatt, Other Affiliate Vladimir Tenev, Other Affiliate New Enterprise Associates 15, L.P., Other Affiliate Index Ventures VI (Jersey), L.P. for Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC entitled "Notice of Related Cases and Notice of Pedency of Other Action or Proceeding" (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC of re #1 Notice of Removal (Monek Anderson, Eric) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/21/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Class Action) from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 20-CIV-01482, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14349973). Filed by Robinhood Securities, LLC, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Brandon Wisoff in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-8 to Declaration of C. Brandon Wisoff, #3 Declaration of Miles Wellesley in Support of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 4/7/2020) Modified on 4/7/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinberg v. Robinhood Markets, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Steinberg
Represented By: Tyson Carl Redenbarger
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Anya N. Thepot
Represented By: Noorjahan Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Maeve Louise O'Connor
Represented By: Elliot Greenfield
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Represented By: Maeve O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Financial LLC
Represented By: Maeve Louise O'Connor
Represented By: Elliot Greenfield
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Represented By: Maeve O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Securities, LLC
Represented By: Maeve Louise O'Connor
Represented By: Elliot Greenfield
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Represented By: Maeve O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?