Xia v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mengni Xia
Defendant: Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc. and Robinhood Securities, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv02352
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/22/2020. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASES. The Court has consolidated the related actions for all pre-trial proceedings and designated the lowest-numbered case, Case No. 3:20-cv-01626-JD, as the lead case. Dkt. No. 59. All underlying cases will be closed by the Clerk, other than Case No. 3:20-cv-3550-JD, in which a motion to remand is pending. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/15/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION AND INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/14/2020. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Robinhood Financial LLC, Other Affiliate Robinhood Securities, LLC, Other Affiliate Baiju Bhatt, Other Affiliate Vladimir Tenev, Other Affiliate New Enterprise Associates 15, L.P., Other Affiliate Index Ventures VI (Jersey), L.P. for Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendants Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC, and Robinhood Securities, LLC to Respond to Complaint filed by Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Monek Anderson (Monek Anderson, Eric) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Brandon Wisoff (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 5/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/1/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/30/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/22/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mauriello, Thomas) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14351653.). Filed byMengni Xia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mauriello, Thomas) (Filed on 4/7/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xia v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mengni Xia
Represented By: Thomas Dominic Mauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Financial, LLC
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Securities, LLC
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?