California Sportfishing Protection Alliance v. Foundation Constructors, Inc.
Plaintiff: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance
Defendant: Foundation Constructors, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02443
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by California Sportfishing Protection Alliance. Service waived by California Sportfishing Protection Alliance waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Barnes, Anthony) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jan A. Greben, Counsel for Defendant on 5/5/2020 by California Sportfishing Protection Alliance. Waiver of Service due by 6/4/2020. (Barnes, Anthony) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Sportfishing Protection Alliance (Barnes, Anthony) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Sportfishing Protection Alliance.. (Barnes, Anthony) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Defendant Foundation Constructors, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/23/2020. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Barnes, Anthony) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Civil Penalties (Federal Water Pollution Control Act, 33 U.S.C. Sections 1251 et seq.) against Defendant Foundation Constructors, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14359563). Filed by California Sportfishing Protection Alliance. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 11.22.19 NOI, #(2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnes, Anthony) (Filed on 4/9/2020) Modified on 4/10/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance v. Foundation Constructors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance
Represented By: Anthony Michael Barnes
Represented By: Jason Robert Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foundation Constructors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?