Karigaca v. Southwest Airlines Co. et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Labrador, Marcus Johnson, Kenya Lattimore and Misha Karigaca
Defendant: County of Alameda and Southwest Airlines Co.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02598
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2020 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Kenya Lattimore, Marcus Johnson, Manuel Labrador, Misha Karigaca . (Urick, Nick) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Karigaca Misha in support of Complaint. (Urick, Nick) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Alameda, Southwest Airlines Co. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14374871.). Filed byMisha Karigaca, Karigaca Misha. (Urick, Nick) (Filed on 4/14/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karigaca v. Southwest Airlines Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Labrador
Represented By: Nick A Urick
Represented By: Shumsha B. Hanif
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Dobbins
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Johnson
Represented By: Nick A Urick
Represented By: Shumsha B. Hanif
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Dobbins
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenya Lattimore
Represented By: Nick A Urick
Represented By: Shumsha B. Hanif
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Dobbins
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misha Karigaca
Represented By: Nick A Urick
Represented By: Shumsha B. Hanif
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Dobbins
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?