Hunker Solar River, LLC v. Sunrise Energy, LLC
Petitioner: Hunker Solar River, LLC
Respondent: Sunrise Energy, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv02673
Filed: April 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RESEALING DOCUMENTS Re: #29 Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 29 Renewed Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal filed by Hunker Solar River, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Neudecker, James) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 28 JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 5/18/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 23 Petition to Compel Arbitration filed by Hunker Solar River, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 5/18/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 26 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sunrise Energy, LLC.. (Baum, John) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration re #21 Statement of Non-Opposition filed by Hunker Solar River, LLC. (Neudecker, James) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 24 Statement of Non-Opposition to re #13 Order Regarding Motion to Seal and Setting Briefing Schedule Petition filed by Sunrise Energy, LLC. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Maldonado, Adam) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Respondent shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge 5/19/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 21 Statement of Non-Opposition to re #11 Amended Notice of Hearing on Petition to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to Federal Arbitration Act [9 U.S.C. Section 4] filed by Sunrise Energy, LLC. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Baum, John) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER UNSEALING DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 5/8/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hunker Solar River, LLC.. (Neudecker, James) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hunker Solar River, LLC re #17 Response ( Non Motion ) (Neudecker, James) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #13 Order, Regarding Motion to Seal and Setting Briefing Schedule on Petition by Hunker Solar River, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Neudecker, James) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hunker Solar River, LLC re #3 Order, and Standing Order of Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim (Haevernick, Joshua) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hunker Solar River, LLC re #13 Order, (Haevernick, Joshua) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Hunker Solar River, LLC of re #8 Response, re #7 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, re #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Haevernick, Joshua) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO SEAL AND SETTING BREIFING SCHEDULE ON PETITION. Opposition due by 5/11/2020. Reply due by 5/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 5/1/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020) Modified on 5/4/2020 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Petitioner shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/8/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing Re: Petition to Compel Arbitration set for 6/8/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Hunker Solar River, LLC of Hearing of Motion on Petition to Compel Arbitration (Haevernick, Joshua) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hunker Solar River, LLC of Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Haevernick, Joshua) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hunker Solar River, LLC of Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Haevernick, Joshua) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #7 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, by Hunker Solar River, LLC. (Haevernick, Joshua) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #1 and #6 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Petition to Compel Arbitration filed by Hunker Solar River, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Supplemental Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Amended Declaration of Brandon Conard, #3 Redacted Exhibit A to Conard Decl., #4 Unredacted Exhibit A to Conard Decl., #5 Redacted Exhibit B to Conard Decl., #6 Unredacted Exhibit B to Conard Decl., #7 Redacted Exhibit C to Conard Decl., #8 Unredacted Exhibit C to Conard Decl., #9 Redacted Exhibit D to Conard Decl., #10 Unredacted Exhibit D to Conard Decl., #11 Redacted Exhibit E to Conard Decl., #12 Unredacted Exhibit E to Conard Decl., #13 Redacted Exhibit F to Conard Decl., #14 Unredacted Exhibit F to Conard Decl., #15 Redacted Exhibit G to Conard Decl., #16 Unredacted Exhibit G to Conard Decl., #17 Proposed Order, #18 Notice of Petition to Compel Arbitration, #19 Redacted Petition to Compel Arbitration, #20 Unredacted Petition to Compel Arbitration, #21 Proposed Order)(Haevernick, Joshua) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/4/2020. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Reserving Ruling re #1 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Petition to Compel Arbitration and Supporting Documents filed by Hunker Solar River, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 4/20/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/1/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 1 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Petition to Compel Arbitration and Supporting Documents (Filing Fee of $400.00 Paid, Receipt # 971-14385606) filed by Hunker Solar River, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Brandon Conard, #2 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G (Part 1), #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G (Part 2), #10 Unredacted Version of Notice of Petition to Compel Arbitration, #11 Unredacted Version of Notice of Petition to Compel Arbitration, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Unredacted Version of Order Compelling Arbitration, #14 Proposed Order)(Haevernick, Joshua) (Filed on 4/17/2020) Modified on 4/17/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunker Solar River, LLC v. Sunrise Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hunker Solar River, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Kendall Haevernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sunrise Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?