Fraser et al v. Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Elander, Iris Delgado, Kat Hall, Chevalia Morgan, Adrienne Fraser, Carolyn Flowers, Christa Rodriguez, Jill Mayer, Codey DeNoyelles, Petrina Fennell and Eugene F. Elander
Defendant: Save Mart Supermarkets, Rembrandt Enterprises Inc, Albertson's Companies Inc, Prairie Star Farms LLC, Opal Foods LLC, Trader Joe's Company, Stater Bros Holdings Inc, Michael Foods Inc, Wabash Valley Produce Inc, Amazon.Com Inc., Weaver Bros Inc, Trillium Farm Holdings LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Hickman's Egg Ranch Inc, Whole Foods Market Group Inc, Raley's, Centrum Valley Farms LP, Sparboe Foods Corp, Rose Acre Farms Inc, Cal-Maine Foods, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corp, Hillandale Farms, Winco Holdings Inc, Herbruck's Poultry Ranch Inc, Daybreak Foods Inc, The Kroger Co. and Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02733
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 118 Summons Issued as to Defendant Prairie Star Farms LLC. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #106 Stipulation. Response due 8/4/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #102 Stipulation. Responsive pleading due 8/4/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #101 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #100 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #93 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #86 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #59 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Sparboe Foods Corp.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #58 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Herbruck's Poultry Ranch.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #57 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal re: Amazon.com, Inc.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #99 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal re: SaveMart Supermarkets.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Order as Modified by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #79 Stipulation Re Case Deadlines. Answer to complaint due 8/4/2020; opposition to Motion to Dismiss due 9/3/2020; reply due 9/24/2020; hearing re: Motion to Dismiss set for 10/15/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Initial Case Management Conference remains on calendar for 7/2/2020 at 9:30 a.m.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 106 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT WINCO HOLDINGS, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Winco Holdings Inc. (Pyle, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/18/2020) Modified on 6/18/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #77 Stipulation. Response due 8/7/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 104 Proposed Summons. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 103 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Rose Acre Farm, Inc. (Cary, Andrew) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 102 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTEND RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE filed by Albertson's Companies Inc. (Murphy, William) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 101 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for James A. King, (Filing Fee $310.00, receipt number 0971-14595795) filed by Rose Acre Farms Inc. (Cary, Andrew) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 100 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jay L. Levine, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14595643) filed by Rose Acre Farms Inc. (Cary, Andrew) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 99 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS Without Prejudice by Codey DeNoyelles, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Petrina Fennell, Carolyn Flowers, Adrienne Fraser, Kat Hall, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Christa Rodriguez (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/18/2020) Modified on 6/18/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2020 Filing 98 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options with Plaintiff Carolyn Flowers (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 97 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options with Plaintiff Christa Rodriguez (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 96 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options with Plaintiff Jill Mayer (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 95 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options with Plaintiff Cody DeNoyelles (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R Chuk (Chuk, Stephen) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 93 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14593449) filed by Daybreak Foods Inc. (Chuk, Stephen) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher E Ondeck (Ondeck, Christopher) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 91 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ondeck, Christopher) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 90 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14592193) (Filing fee previously paid on 06/17/2020) filed by Daybreak Foods Inc. (Ondeck, Christopher) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 89 Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 filed by Winco Holdings, Inc. (Pyle, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 88 Certification of Interested Entities filed by Winco Holdings Inc (Pyle, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 87 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options SPECIAL APPEARANCE (Attachments: #1 ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel)(Hall, Marcus) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14592193) filed by Daybreak Foods Inc. (Casazza, Kyle) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 85 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options SPECIAL APPEARANCE (Attachments: #1 ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel)(Hall, Marcus) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 84 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant Winco Holdings, Inc. (Pyle, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Alexander Casazza (Casazza, Kyle) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 82 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Daybreak Foods Inc (Casazza, Kyle) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 81 Corporate Disclosure Statement Under Rule 7.1 filed by Daybreak Foods Inc (Casazza, Kyle) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Alexander Casazza (Casazza, Kyle) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 79 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING CASE DEADLINES filed by Daybreak Foods Inc. (Casazza, Kyle) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 78 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Stortz, Michael) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 77 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re Stipulated Request to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline re #1 Complaint filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Stortz, Michael) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 76 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Juthamas Judy Suwatanapongched on behalf of Save Mart Supermarkets (Suwatanapongched, Juthamas) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 74 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (Kiser, Livia) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 73 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options with Plaintiff Chevalia Morgan (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 72 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options with Plaintiff Petrina Fennell (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 71 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options with Plaintiff Kathy Hall (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 70 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options with Plaintiff Eugene Elander (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 69 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options with Plaintiff Iris Delgado (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 68 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: #62 MOTION for Uniform Schedule : Pursuant to L.R. 7-2(a), hearing date for Motion Hearing is rescheduled for 7/23/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Briefing remains unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Codey DeNoyelles, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Petrina Fennell, Carolyn Flowers, Adrienne Fraser, Kat Hall, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Christa Rodriguez re #21 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 66 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 65 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE TO (re #34 DEFENDANT SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6); and MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION) - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #64 filed by Codey DeNoyelles, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Petrina Fennell, Carolyn Flowers, Adrienne Fraser, Kat Hall, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Christa Rodriguez. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 64 *Erroneous Entry - Please Refer to Document #65 *OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #34 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6); and MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION ) filed byCodey DeNoyelles, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Petrina Fennell, Carolyn Flowers, Adrienne Fraser, Kat Hall, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Christa Rodriguez. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/12/2020) Modified on 6/12/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Hanson Pyle , Phillip Allan Trajan Perez and Julianne M. Avery (Pyle, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for Uniform Schedule filed by Codey DeNoyelles, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Petrina Fennell, Carolyn Flowers, Adrienne Fraser, Kat Hall, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Christa Rodriguez. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 6/26/2020. Replies due by 7/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC. Without Prejudice by Codey DeNoyelles, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Petrina Fennell, Carolyn Flowers, Adrienne Fraser, Kat Hall, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Christa Rodriguez (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 9, 2020 Filing 60 Certification of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 filed by Hickman's Egg Ranch Inc. (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 9, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of SPARBOE FOODS CORP. Without Prejudice by Codey DeNoyelles, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Petrina Fennell, Carolyn Flowers, Adrienne Fraser, Kat Hall, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Christa Rodriguez (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/9/2020) Modified on 6/18/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of HERBRUCKS'S POULTRY RANCH, INC. Without Prejudice by Codey DeNoyelles, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Petrina Fennell, Carolyn Flowers, Adrienne Fraser, Kat Hall, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Christa Rodriguez (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/9/2020) Modified on 6/18/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of AMAZON.COM, INC. Without Prejudice by Codey DeNoyelles, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Petrina Fennell, Carolyn Flowers, Adrienne Fraser, Kat Hall, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Christa Rodriguez (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/9/2020) Modified on 6/18/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #48 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of HILLANDALE FARMS Without Prejudice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 9, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew William Cary (Cary, Andrew) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #47 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of WABASH VALLEY PRODUCE, INC. Without Prejudice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 9, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Eewu Tsai and by Micah Chavin (Tsai, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 9, 2020 Filing 52 Certification of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R.Civ.P. 7.1 ntities filed by Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (Kiser, Livia) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 9, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory L. Burleson for Defendant Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (Burleson, Cory) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 9, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Livia M. Kiser for Defendant Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (Kiser, Livia) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by James Dominic Campodonico (Campodonico, James) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of HILLANDALE FARMS Without Prejudice filed by Codey DeNoyelles, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Petrina Fennell, Carolyn Flowers, Adrienne Fraser, Kat Hall, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Christa Rodriguez (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/5/2020) Modified on 6/9/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of WABASH VALLEY PRODUCE, INC. Without Prejudice filled by Codey DeNoyelles, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Petrina Fennell, Carolyn Flowers, Adrienne Fraser, Kat Hall, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Christa Rodriguez (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/5/2020) Modified on 6/9/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2020 Filing 46 Summons Issued as to Defendant Raley's. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 45 Proposed Summons. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Ben Z. Steinberger (Steinberger, Ben) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 43 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Amazon.Com Inc.. (Doll, Gregory) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 42 Notice of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Save Mart Supermarkets - [FRCP 7.1] (Henry, Sascha) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Save Mart Supermarkets of re #34 DEFENDANT SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6); and MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Henry, Sascha) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Sascha Von Mende Henry (Henry, Sascha) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Sascha Von Mende Henry - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ISABELLA LANGONE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS (Henry, Sascha) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Sascha Von Mende Henry - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF LEO B. CASERIA ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS (Henry, Sascha) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 37 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Save Mart Supermarkets re #34 DEFENDANT SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6); and MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Henry, Sascha) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #29 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Rembrandt Enterprises, INC., filed by Carolyn Flowers, Petrina Fennell, Eugene F. Elander, Codey DeNoyelles, Kat Hall, Iris Delgado, Adrienne Fraser, Chevalia Morgan, Jill Mayer, Christa Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/26/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Save Mart Supermarkets identifying Corporate Parent Save Mart Supermarkets, Corporate Parent Save Mart Supermarkets for Save Mart Supermarkets. (Henry, Sascha) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 34 DEFENDANT SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6); and MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION filed by Save Mart Supermarkets. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 6/11/2020. Replies due by 6/18/2020. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order to Motion to Dismiss)(Langone, Isabella) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kat Hall, Codey DeNoyelles, Adrienne Fraser, Christa Rodriguez, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Carolyn Flowers, Petrina Fennell. Service waived by Costco Wholesale Corp waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kat Hall, Codey DeNoyelles, Adrienne Fraser, Christa Rodriguez, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Carolyn Flowers, Petrina Fennell. Service waived by Trillium Farm Holdings LLC waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kat Hall, Codey DeNoyelles, Adrienne Fraser, Christa Rodriguez, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Carolyn Flowers, Petrina Fennell. Service waived by Centrum Valley Farms LP waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kat Hall, Codey DeNoyelles, Adrienne Fraser, Christa Rodriguez, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Carolyn Flowers, Petrina Fennell. Service waived by Albertson's Companies Inc waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Rembrandt Enterprises, INC. by Codey DeNoyelles, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Petrina Fennell, Carolyn Flowers, Adrienne Fraser, Kat Hall, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Christa Rodriguez (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kat Hall, Codey DeNoyelles, Adrienne Fraser, Christa Rodriguez, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Carolyn Flowers, Petrina Fennell. Service waived by Save Mart Supermarkets waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kat Hall, Codey DeNoyelles, Adrienne Fraser, Christa Rodriguez, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Carolyn Flowers, Petrina Fennell. Service waived by Whole Foods Market Group Inc waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kat Hall, Codey DeNoyelles, Adrienne Fraser, Christa Rodriguez, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Carolyn Flowers, Petrina Fennell. Service waived by Winco Holdings Inc waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kat Hall, Codey DeNoyelles, Adrienne Fraser, Christa Rodriguez, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Carolyn Flowers, Petrina Fennell. Service waived by Daybreak Foods Inc waiver sent on 5/21/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kat Hall, Codey DeNoyelles, Adrienne Fraser, Christa Rodriguez, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Carolyn Flowers, Petrina Fennell. Service waived by Opal Foods LLC waiver sent on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kat Hall, Codey DeNoyelles, Adrienne Fraser, Christa Rodriguez, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Carolyn Flowers, Petrina Fennell. Service waived by Michael Foods Inc waiver sent on 5/13/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hickman's Egg Ranch Inc. Service waived by Hickman's Egg Ranch Inc waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Phillips, John) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/20/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #19 Stipulation. Answer due 6/17/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline filed by Walmart Inc.. (Stortz, Michael) (Filed on 5/18/2020) Modified on 5/19/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael James Stortz (Stortz, Michael) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kat Hall, Codey DeNoyelles, Adrienne Fraser, Christa Rodriguez, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Carolyn Flowers, Petrina Fennell. Service waived by The Kroger Co. waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Codey DeNoyelles, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Petrina Fennell, Carolyn Flowers, Adrienne Fraser, Kat Hall, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Christa Rodriguez 0f re 2 Case Assigned by Intake, re #1 Complaint, re #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, Request for Waiver of Summons, Other Initial Pleadings and Required Disclosures (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Codey DeNoyelles, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Petrina Fennell, Carolyn Flowers, Adrienne Fraser, Kat Hall, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Christa Rodriguez re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Complaint,, #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, Request for Waiver of Summons, Other Initial Pleadings and Required Disclosures (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 05/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Amazon.Com Inc... (Doll, Gregory) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lawrence Doll (Doll, Gregory) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kat Hall, Codey DeNoyelles, Adrienne Fraser, Christa Rodriguez, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Carolyn Flowers, Petrina Fennell. Service waived by Herbruck's Poultry Ranch Inc waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kat Hall, Codey DeNoyelles, Adrienne Fraser, Christa Rodriguez, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Carolyn Flowers, Petrina Fennell. Service waived by Amazon.Com Inc. waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kat Hall, Codey DeNoyelles, Adrienne Fraser, Christa Rodriguez, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Carolyn Flowers, Petrina Fennell. Service waived by Wabash Valley Produce Inc waiver sent on 4/21/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kat Hall, Codey DeNoyelles, Adrienne Fraser, Christa Rodriguez, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Carolyn Flowers, Petrina Fennell. Service waived by Rose Acre Farms Inc waiver sent on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of WEAVER BROS. INC. Without Prejudice by Codey DeNoyelles, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Petrina Fennell, Carolyn Flowers, Adrienne Fraser, Kat Hall, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Christa Rodriguez (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Codey DeNoyelles, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Petrina Fennell, Carolyn Flowers, Adrienne Fraser, Kat Hall, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Christa Rodriguez.. (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of TRADER JOE'S CO. without prejudice by Codey DeNoyelles, Iris Delgado, Eugene F. Elander, Petrina Fennell, Carolyn Flowers, Adrienne Fraser, Kat Hall, Jill Mayer, Chevalia Morgan, Christa Rodriguez (Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2020 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/5/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Case can not be randomly assigned to judge due to Nature of SuitsSelection. Case open using Nature of Suit Selection of 190,however, Nature of Suit selection on Civil Cover Sheet is 890. Please advise the court of which selection is correct or File Amended Civil Cover Sheet as a separate docket entry with correct selection Re: #1 Complaint filed by Adrienne Fraser (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for: (1) Violations of Cal. Penal Code Section 396; (2) Violation of the Unfair Business Practices (Cal. Bus. and Prof. Code Section 17200 et seq.) against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14393281). Filed by Adrienne Fraser, Codey DeNoyelles, Chevalia Morgan, Carolyn Flowers, Petrina Fennell, Jill Mayer, Kat Hall, Eugene F. Elander, Iris Delgado & Christa Rodriguez. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Salgado, Robert) (Filed on 4/20/2020) Modified on 4/21/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fraser et al v. Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Save Mart Supermarkets
Represented By: Leo David Caseria
Represented By: Isabella A Langone
Represented By: Juthamas Judy Suwatanapongched
Represented By: Sascha Von Mende Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rembrandt Enterprises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertson's Companies Inc
Represented By: William Francis Murphy
Represented By: J. Cross Creason, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prairie Star Farms LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opal Foods LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trader Joe's Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stater Bros Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Foods Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wabash Valley Produce Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Lawrence Doll
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Represented By: Kristin A. Linsley, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weaver Bros Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trillium Farm Holdings LLC
Represented By: Marcus T. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hickman's Egg Ranch Inc
Represented By: Micah Aaron Chavin
Represented By: John Paul Phillips
Represented By: Jeffrey Eewu Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raley's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centrum Valley Farms LP
Represented By: Marcus T. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sparboe Foods Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Acre Farms Inc
Represented By: James A. King
Represented By: Ben Z. Steinberger
Represented By: James Dominic Campodonico
Represented By: Jay L. Levine
Represented By: Andrew William Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Maine Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Livia M. Kiser
Represented By: Cory L. Burleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillandale Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winco Holdings Inc
Represented By: Julianne Michelle Avery
Represented By: Phillip Allan Perez
Represented By: Nicholas Hanson Pyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbruck's Poultry Ranch Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daybreak Foods Inc
Represented By: Kyle Alexander Casazza
Represented By: Christopher E Ondeck
Represented By: Stephen R Chuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Michael James Stortz
Represented By: Ali R. Rabbani
Represented By: Shelly A. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Elander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Delgado
Represented By: John Edward Norris
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Represented By: Andrew Wheeler-Berliner,
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Salgado, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kat Hall
Represented By: John Edward Norris
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Represented By: Andrew Wheeler-Berliner,
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Salgado, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chevalia Morgan
Represented By: John Edward Norris
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Represented By: Andrew Wheeler-Berliner,
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Salgado, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne Fraser
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Salgado, III
Represented By: John Edward Norris
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Represented By: Andrew Wheeler-Berliner,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Flowers
Represented By: John Edward Norris
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Represented By: Andrew Wheeler-Berliner,
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Salgado, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa Rodriguez
Represented By: John Edward Norris
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Represented By: Andrew Wheeler-Berliner,
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Salgado, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Mayer
Represented By: John Edward Norris
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Represented By: Andrew Wheeler-Berliner,
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Salgado, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Codey DeNoyelles
Represented By: John Edward Norris
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Represented By: Andrew Wheeler-Berliner,
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Salgado, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petrina Fennell
Represented By: John Edward Norris
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Represented By: Andrew Wheeler-Berliner,
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Salgado, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene F. Elander
Represented By: John Edward Norris
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware
Represented By: Andrew Wheeler-Berliner,
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Salgado, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?