Haideri v. Jumei International Holding Limited et al
Plaintiff: Emal Haideri
Defendant: Zhenquan Ren, Leo Ou Chen, Sean Shao, Jumei International Holding Limited, Mang Su and Adam J. Zhao
Case Number: 3:2020cv02751
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #7 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule on Any Motion to Dismiss.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Marc Faigen (Faigen, Zachary) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy S. Park (Park, Amy) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jumei International Holding Limited identifying Corporate Parent Super ROI Global Holding Limited, Other Affiliate Leo Ou Chen for Jumei International Holding Limited. (Morrison, Peter) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint and Setting Breifing Schedule on Any Motion to Dismiss filed by Jumei International Holding Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zachary Faigen)(Morrison, Peter) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jumei International Holding Limited, Leo Ou Chen, Zhenquan Ren, Sean Shao, Mang Su, Adam J. Zhao. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Holleman, William) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2020 09:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Emal Haideri . (Holleman, William) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19). Please complete correct Civil Cover Shee t and e-file an an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jumei International Holding Limited, Leo Ou Chen, Zhenquan Ren, Sean Shao, Mang Su, Adam J. Zhao ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14394602.). Filed byEmal Haideri. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holleman, William) (Filed on 4/21/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haideri v. Jumei International Holding Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhenquan Ren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Ou Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Shao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jumei International Holding Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mang Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam J. Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emal Haideri
Represented By: William Scott Holleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?