Zhao et al v. United States Citizenship & Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Jing Zhao, Xianghai Min, Wei Wang, Liping Ding, Bo Zhao, Sang Hung Dinh, Peng Cheng, Ting Shao, Haoyu Li, Yue Tang, Yanqun Zhao, Renyuan Gao, Xuexia Xu, Zheqi Geng, Lei Zhou, Lulin You, Xiaoyun Dong, Yunqiu Pu, Xiao Liang, Xuejun Jia, Zongli Ning, Jiayu Wu, Qian Zhong, Hui Huang, Keren Zhu, Zhenlin Li, Julia Theresa S. Yap, Rong Qin, Yuting Zhao, Xiaole Gu, Tao Mu, Wenjun Zhang, Ding Ding, Xiaoyan Tang, Qing Yang, Rufeng Huang, Xuan Cao, Na Li, Li Shen, Yu Zhu, Qiaoting Bao, Weikang Cao, Jun Ma, Jianying Chen, Lifan Deng, Quan Wang, Junping Liu, Xiu He, Qianyu Lin, Yanping Zhu, Yiwen Tang, Zi Yin, Kailin Su, Qin Wang and Qianmin Liu
Defendant: United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Sarah Kendall and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 3:2020cv02770
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jing Zhao.. (Holtzman, David) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/26/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defendants Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Sarah Kendall, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, Chad F. Wolf. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER (Immigration Mandamus Case) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Jing Zhao identifying Other Affiliate Lennar Corporation, Other Affiliate HPS Development Co., L.P., Other Affiliate GSRV I Management, LLC, Other Affiliate GSRV II Management, LLC, Other Affiliate HPS Vertical Development Co.-B, LP for Jing Zhao. (Holtzman, David) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/6/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Holtzman, David) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Writ in the Nature of Mandamus against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14396531). Filed by Plaintiffs Jing Zhao, et al. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Holtzman, David) (Filed on 4/21/2020) Modified on 4/22/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhao et al v. United States Citizenship & Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jing Zhao
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xianghai Min
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wei Wang
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liping Ding
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bo Zhao
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sang Hung Dinh
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peng Cheng
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ting Shao
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haoyu Li
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yue Tang
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yanqun Zhao
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renyuan Gao
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuexia Xu
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zheqi Geng
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lei Zhou
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lulin You
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaoyun Dong
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yunqiu Pu
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiao Liang
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuejun Jia
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zongli Ning
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiayu Wu
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qian Zhong
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hui Huang
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keren Zhu
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhenlin Li
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Theresa S. Yap
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rong Qin
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuting Zhao
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaole Gu
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tao Mu
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wenjun Zhang
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ding Ding
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaoyan Tang
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qing Yang
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rufeng Huang
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuan Cao
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Na Li
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Li Shen
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yu Zhu
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qiaoting Bao
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weikang Cao
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jun Ma
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jianying Chen
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lifan Deng
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quan Wang
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junping Liu
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiu He
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qianyu Lin
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yanping Zhu
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yiwen Tang
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zi Yin
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kailin Su
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qin Wang
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qianmin Liu
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Herbert Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship & Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?