United States of America v. Barland
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Susan Barland
Case Number: 3:2020cv02881
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand bySusan Barland. (Weill, Jay) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States of America. Service waived by Susan Barland waiver sent on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Hendon, Jeremy) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Susan Barland. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2020 02:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2020. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Hendon, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Hendon, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Reduce Civil Penalty Assessments to Judgment against Susan Barland. Filed byUnited States of America. (Filing Fee Waived) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hendon, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/27/2020) Modified on 4/28/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Barland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Barland
Represented By: Steven Morris Katz
Represented By: Jay Robert Weill
Represented By: Travis W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jeremy N Hendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?