Wilson v. Leigh Law Group, P.C, (LLG) et al
Plaintiff: Michael Geary Wilson
Defendant: Brian Lawrence, Fagen, Friedman & Fulfrost, LLP (F3), Alison Paige Buchanan, Leigh Law Group, P.C, (LLG), Long & Levit, LLP (LOLE), Hoge Fenton Jones & Appel, Inc. (HFJA), Seth Nathaniel Eckstein, Jay Toivo Jambeck, Christine Anell Huntoon, Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Ruud & Romo (AALRR), Peter Kirk Fagen, Robert Anthony Martinez, Jonathan Robert Rizzardi, Howard Jay Fulfrost, Mount Diablo Unifed School District/Special Education Local Plan Area (Diablo), Joanne Durkee, Kevin Ellsworth Gilbert, Roy Albert Combs, Damien Berkes Troutman, Orbach, Huff, Suarez & Henderson LLP (OHSH), Linda Mayo, Mandy Gina Leigh, Elizabeth Ann Estes, Cherise Khaund and Debra Mason
Case Number: 3:2020cv03045
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Toivo Jambeck for Defendants Mandy Gina Leigh, Jay Toivo Jambeck, Damien Berkes Troutman, and Leigh Law Group, P.C. (Jambeck, Jay) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Damien Berkes Troutman for Defendants Mandy Gina Leigh, Jay Toivo Jambeck, Damien Berkes Troutman, and Leigh Law Group, P.C. (Troutman, Damien) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 19 Declaration of MICHAEL GEARY WILSON in Support of #18 Order, HIS NOTICE OF HIS INTENT TO AMEND HIS 5/1/2020 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Geary Wilson. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Wilson, Michael) (Filed on 6/26/2020) Modified on 6/29/2020 (arkS, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; DIRECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS. Defendants shall not file a response to plaintiffs complaint unless and until the Court finds, after conducting a review under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), plaintiff is entitled to proceed thereon. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 26, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 23, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Classify Plaintiff as a Vexatious Litigant and Order to Post Security filed by Mount Diablo Unifed School District/Special Education Local Plan Area (Diablo). Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/7/2020. Replies due by 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O)(Gilbert, Kevin) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Michael Geary Wilson. Service waived by Joanne Durkee waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Kevin Ellsworth Gilbert waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Cherise Khaund waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Brian Lawrence waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Robert Anthony Martinez waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Debra Mason waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Linda Mayo waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Mount Diablo Unifed School District/Special Education Local Plan Area (Diablo) waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Orbach, Huff, Suarez & Henderson LLP (OHSH) waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Wilson, Michael) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS RE PACER ACCESS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 19, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 18, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RELATED CASE ORDER. 20-cv-3045, Wilson v. Leigh Law Group, P.C. (LLG) et al., is related to 19-cv-3441, Wilson v. Mount Diablo Unified School District, et al. The Clerk of Court is instructed to reassign the later-filed action to the undersigned. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 12, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 8, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Michael Geary Wilson. Service waived by Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Ruud & Romo (AALRR) waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Alison Paige Buchanan waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Elizabeth Ann Estes waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Hoge Fenton Jones & Appel, Inc. (HFJA) waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Christine Anell Huntoon waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Wilson, Michael) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Michael Geary Wilson. Service waived by Jay Toivo Jambeck waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Mandy Gina Leigh waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Leigh Law Group, P.C, (LLG) waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Damien Berkes Troutman waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Wilson, Michael) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Michael Geary Wilson. Service waived by Roy Albert Combs waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Seth Nathaniel Eckstein waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Peter Kirk Fagen waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Fagen, Friedman & Fulfrost, LLP (F3) waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Howard Jay Fulfrost waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Long & Levit, LLP (LOLE) waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Jonathan Robert Rizzardi waiver sent on 5/5/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Wilson, Michael) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 19-cv- 3441-MMC. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/6/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Geary Wilson. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Michael Geary Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Re: Pacer Access filed by Michael Geary Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 Motion to Relate Cases by Michael Geary Wilson. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020) Modified on 5/6/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Geary Wilson. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) (no process) against Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Ruud & Romo (AALRR), Alison Paige Buchanan, Roy Albert Combs, Joanne Durkee, Seth Nathaniel Eckstein, Elizabeth Ann Estes, Peter Kirk Fagen, Fagen, Friedman & Fulfrost, LLP (F3), Howard Jay Fulfrost, Kevin Ellsworth Gilbert, Hoge Fenton Jones & Appel, Inc. (HFJA), Christine Anell Huntoon, Jay Toivo Jambeck, Cherise Khaund, Brian Lawrence, Mandy Gina Leigh, Leigh Law Group, P.C, (LLG), Long & Levit, LLP (LOLE), Robert Anthony Martinez, Debra Mason, Linda Mayo, Mount Diablo Unifed School District/Special Education Local Plan Area (Diablo), Orbach, Huff, Suarez & Henderson LLP (OHSH), Jonathan Robert Rizzardi, Damien Berkes Troutman. Filed by Michael Geary Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Leigh Law Group, P.C, (LLG) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fagen, Friedman & Fulfrost, LLP (F3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Paige Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigh Law Group, P.C, (LLG)
Represented By: Jay Toivo Jambeck
Represented By: Damien Berkes Troutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long & Levit, LLP (LOLE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoge Fenton Jones & Appel, Inc. (HFJA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Nathaniel Eckstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Toivo Jambeck
Represented By: Jay Toivo Jambeck
Represented By: Damien Berkes Troutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Anell Huntoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Ruud & Romo (AALRR)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Kirk Fagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Anthony Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Robert Rizzardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Jay Fulfrost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Diablo Unifed School District/Special Education Local Plan Area (Diablo)
Represented By: Kevin E. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Durkee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Ellsworth Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Albert Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damien Berkes Troutman
Represented By: Jay Toivo Jambeck
Represented By: Damien Berkes Troutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbach, Huff, Suarez & Henderson LLP (OHSH)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy Gina Leigh
Represented By: Jay Toivo Jambeck
Represented By: Damien Berkes Troutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Ann Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherise Khaund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Geary Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?