Miller v. Liberati
Plaintiff: Terry Scott Miller
Defendant: Vito Liberati
Case Number: 3:2020cv03547
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 7/21/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Vito Liberati. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/10/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 SEAMAN'S COMPLAINT for Personal Injury - Negligence Under the Jones Act; Demand for Jury Trial against Vito Liberati, in personam, the F/V My Gal, USCG Doc. No. 594812, her engines, tackle, apparel, furniture, and appurtenances, in rem. Filed by Terry Miller. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bull, Edward) (Filed on 5/27/2020) Modified on 5/28/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Liberati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vito Liberati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Scott Miller
Represented By: Kurt Leonard Micklow
Represented By: Edward M. Bull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?