Great American Insurance Company of New York v. Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc. and Blue Cargo Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv03557
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 9/10/2020 is reset to 10/15/2020 at 9:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. In light of the parties' notice of settlement, the plaintiff need not submit the short update ordered at ECF No. 9. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/8/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: In light of the notice of settlement, the court continues the initial CMC from 8/27/2020 to 9/10/2020 at 11:00 AM to avoid losing track of the case, and directs the filing of a stipulated dismissal or a short update by 9/3/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Great American Insurance Company of New York NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING AND RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1614698626?pwd=eXlQRThFajBjT0tieVBaYWpjMjFodz09Meeting ID: 161 469 8626Password: 546984Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generat ed by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The deadline for the defendant, Mediterranean Shipping Company, to respond to the complaint was 7/1/2020. The defendant has not appeared or responded. The court asks the plaintiff to submit a short update regarding the defendant's appearance by 7/16/2020. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/7/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great American Insurance Company of New York. Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc. served on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Blue Cargo Group, LLC, Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc., Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/20/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/11/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Great American Insurance Company of New York.. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Great American Insurance Company of New York identifying Other Affiliate Unipac Shipping, Inc. for Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damage to Cargo against Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc., Blue Cargo Group, LLC.(Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14512896.). Filed by Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 5/28/2020) Modified on 5/29/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company of New York v. Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cargo Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Joshua E. Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?