Susu et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Plaintiff: Jeries Sousou and Violette Susu
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 3:2020cv03563
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 19 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/21/2020. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 15, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE: The hearing date of July 30, 2020 at 8:00 AM is hereby VACATED. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 15, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by The Bank of New York Mellon Response to Order to Show Cause; Exhibits A-C; and Proof of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scott, William) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/23/2020. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 16, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING HEARING.The hearnig on #7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution is continued to 7/30/2020 at 8:00 a.m. before Judge William Alsup. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/24/2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge William Alsup. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RELATING Susu v. Bayview Loan Servicing LLC (Case No. 17-cv-5879 WHA) and Susu v. The Bank of New York Mellon (Case No. 20-cv-03563 DMR). Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/12/2020. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Bank of New York Mellon.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scott, William) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 Renotice motion hearing re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution Amended Notice of Motion for July 23, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. filed byThe Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Scott, William) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Set/Reset Hearing as to #7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2020 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Please Re-Notice the hearing date for 7/23/2020 at 1:00 P.M. Do not re-file the motion. Use the event Re-Notice to correct the hearing time. Re:[ 7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by The Bank of New York Mellon (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/12/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 Amended Proof of Service for Motion to Dismiss. by The Bank of New York Mellon. Amendment to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution (Scott, William) (Filed on 6/5/2020) Modified on 6/8/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2020 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:20-cv-03563-DMR. Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by The Bank of New York Mellon (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by The Bank of New York Mellon. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 6/18/2020. Replies due by 6/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scott, William) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
May 31, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendant filed a motion to relate this case to Case Nos. 18-cv-7813-JCS, 18-cv-135-WHA, and 17-cv-5879. Docket No. #5 . Pursuant to Local Rule No. 3-12(b), an administrative motion to relate must be filed in the lowest-numbered action. Docket No. #5 is terminated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Relate Case with Proof of Service filed by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scott, William) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Bank of New York Mellon Service of Judge's standing orders on Plaintiff (Scott, William) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/11/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Alameda. Their case number is HG19021778. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14514100). Filed byThe Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scott, William) (Filed on 5/28/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Susu et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeries Sousou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violette Susu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: William Jason Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?