Nitetek Licensing LLC v. ChargePoint, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nitetek Licensing LLC
Defendant: ChargePoint, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv03594
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2020 Filing 14 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2020, 10:00 AM. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than Monday, August 24, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1612857657?pwd=WE5Gcm1zS293WU84V0tyd0c2Ulp1UT09Meeting ID: 161 285 7657Password: 547298Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Initial Case Managemen t Conference set for 8/26/2020, 10:00 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2020)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/20/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nitetek Licensing LLC.. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/30/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/2/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to ChargePoint, Inc.. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/12/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Nitetek Licensing LLC re #1 Complaint, (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding PATENT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Nitetek Licensing LLC . (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against ChargePoint, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14518167.). Filed byNitetek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet CAND 44 (Rev. 06/17) used at case opening. Please complete correct Civil Cov er Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19), file Amended Cover Sheet as a separate docket entry Re: #3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Nitetek Licensing LLC (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nitetek Licensing LLC v. ChargePoint, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChargePoint, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nitetek Licensing LLC
Represented By: Steven Whitefield Ritcheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?