Carpita v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Christopher Carpita
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv03598
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: USDC-Maryland, 1:20-cv-01105, Carpita v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as CV 20-3598 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order CTO-210 cc: JPMDL (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:20-cv-01105. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER transferring case to USDC Northern District of California. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 5/20/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Carpita. Monsanto Company served on 5/7/2020, answer due 5/28/2020.(Moore, Aaron)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Monsanto Company. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 30, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8632328.), filed by Christopher Carpita. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Notice of Related Case)(Moore, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpita v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Carpita
Represented By: Aaron L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?