Hirsberg v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: George Hirsberg
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv03602
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Missouri, 4:20-cv-00616, Hirsberg v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-3602-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order #4 cc: JPMDL (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00616. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO)
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-211) regarding MDL No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO)
May 6, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Adam M. Goffstein. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. (BAK)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff George Hirsberg Process Server: Frederick Investigation, Inc. (BAK)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7900555, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by George Hirsberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Attachment Notice of Intent to Use Process Server)(Goffstein, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirsberg v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Hirsberg
Represented By: Adam M. Goffstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?