Klingensmith v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: John Joseph Klingensmith, Jr.
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv03603
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED re 16-md-2741-VC: USDC, Middle District of Florida (Ft. Myers), 2:20-cv-00325-SPC-MRM, John Joseph Klingensmith, Jr. v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-03603-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-210) cc: JPMDL (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 Case Transferred in from United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida (Ft. Myers); Case Number 2:20-cv-00325-SPC-MRM. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California. MDL case number: MDL-2741 (MAA)
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by John Joseph Klingensmith, Jr. (Chambers, G.)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by John Joseph Klingensmith, Jr. Related case(s): yes (Chambers, G.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2741, Information emailed to MDL Panel on May 6, 2020, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Complaint) (MLS)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/6/2020. (WRW)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (MLS)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-325-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 113A-16775262) filed by John Joseph Klingensmith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Chambers, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klingensmith v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Joseph Klingensmith, Jr.
Represented By: T. Michael Morgan
Represented By: Genevieve Katherine Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?