Parenteau et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Nancy Parenteau and Joseph Parenteau
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv03651
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 2741, District of Massachusetts, 1:20-cv-10480 ADB, Parenteau et al v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-03651 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 211 cc: JPMDL (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:20-cv-10480. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 Case Electronically transferred to the Northern District of California pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 5/29/2020 (McDonagh, Christina)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number CTO-211 in MDL Case 2741 received from Northern District of California requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (McDonagh, Christina)
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 211 in MDL Case 2741 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Monsanto Company served on 5/14/2020, answer due 6/4/2020. (O'Donnell, Erika)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Weyland, Loren)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8148358 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Joseph Parenteau, Nancy Parenteau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(O'Donnell, Erika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parenteau et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Parenteau
Represented By: Erika A. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Parenteau
Represented By: Erika A. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?