Jones v. Legrand
Plaintiff: Franklin Michael Jones
Defendant: Bertrand Paul Legrand
Case Number: 3:2020cv03688
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bertrand Paul Legrand. Filed byFranklin Michael Jones. (Briggs, Carleton) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: #9 Motion to Strike: Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-2 motions must be noticed for hearing not less than 35 days after filing of the motion. Accordingly, the motion hearing set for 8/10/2020 is hereby vacated. Counsel is directed to re-notice the motion for hearing in accordance with the local rule. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint and Request for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Bertrand Paul Legrand. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 7/28/2020. Replies due by 8/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in support of motion, #2 Declaration Declaration of Brian A. Barnhorst, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Electronic Service)(Barnhorst, Brian) (Filed on 7/14/2020) Modified on 7/14/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Franklin Michael Jones (Briggs, Carleton) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Franklin Michael Jones.. (Briggs, Carleton) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bertrand Paul Legrand. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/18/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Franklin Michael Jones Re: #1 Complaint. (Briggs, Carleton) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Franklin Michael Jones (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Briggs, Carleton) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR: 1. Defamation [Slander] 2. False Light Invasion of Privacy 3. Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress against Bertrand Paul Legrand ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14535682.). Filed byFranklin Michael Jones. (Briggs, Carleton) (Filed on 6/3/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Legrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Michael Jones
Represented By: Carleton Lee Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bertrand Paul Legrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?