Redmond v. Albertsons Companies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eleisha Redmond
Defendant: Albertsons Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv03692
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Albertsons Companies, Inc... (Stimeling, Kathleen) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Jason Wu (Wu, Andrew) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/28/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Regarding Defendants' Deadline to Respond to the Complaint filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc.. (Stimeling, Kathleen) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Albertsons Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Albertsons Companies, Inc. for Albertsons Companies, Inc.. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Stimeling, Kathleen) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Stimeling (Stimeling, Kathleen) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eleisha Redmond.. (Maya, Theodore) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eleisha Redmond. Albertsons Companies, Inc. served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/6/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Albertsons Companies, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/17/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Eleisha Redmond (Maya, Theodore) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Maya, Theodore) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Albertsons Companies, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14536244). Filed by Eleisha Redmond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maya, Theodore) (Filed on 6/3/2020) Modified on 6/4/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redmond v. Albertsons Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Jason Wu
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Stimeling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleisha Redmond
Represented By: Theodore Walter Maya
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?