Snow et al v. Eventbrite, Inc.
Plaintiff: anthony piceno, Linda Conner and sherri snow
Defendant: Eventbrite, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv03698
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2020 02:00 PM. Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/30/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/29/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant Eventbrite, Inc. to Respond to Complaint and for Limited Discovery filed by Eventbrite, Inc.. (Cashman, Adam) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eventbrite, Inc... (Cashman, Adam) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eventbrite, Inc. and Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Parties or Persons (Cashman, Adam) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Stephen Tilley (Tilley, Douglas) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Seth Cashman (Cashman, Adam) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Linda Conner, anthony piceno, sherri snow.. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/6/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Eventbrite, Inc. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/18/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eventbrite, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14539198.). Filed bysherri snow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Safier, Seth) (Filed on 6/4/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snow et al v. Eventbrite, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: anthony piceno
Represented By: Seth Adam Safier
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Conner
Represented By: Seth Adam Safier
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: sherri snow
Represented By: Seth Adam Safier
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eventbrite, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Stephen Tilley
Represented By: Adam Seth Cashman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?