Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC v. Otis McAllister, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC and Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Chicken of the Sea International
Defendant: Otis McAllister, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv03711
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC (Panchapakesan, Gopi) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC. Service waived by Otis McAllister, Inc. waiver sent on 6/16/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Diamond, Sarah) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding A Patent or Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Diamond, Sarah) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Thai Union North America, Inc. for Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC. (Diamond, Sarah) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Thai Union North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Thai Union Group PCL for Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC. (Diamond, Sarah) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #8 *** Statement Rule 7.1 Disciosure Statement by Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC. (Diamond, Sarah) (Filed on 6/8/2020) Modified on 6/9/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (Diamond, Sarah) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2020 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/19/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19). Please complete correct Civil Cover She et and e-file an an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Otis McAllister, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14542229.). Filed byTri-Union Seafoods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Panchapakesan, Gopi) (Filed on 6/4/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC v. Otis McAllister, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC
Represented By: Gopi K. Panchapakesan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-Union Seafoods, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Chicken of the Sea International
Represented By: Gopi K. Panchapakesan
Represented By: Celeste Marie Brecht
Represented By: Susan E Hollander
Represented By: Sarah E. Diamond
Represented By: Caroline Drew Murray
Represented By: Ekwan Eric Rhow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis McAllister, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?